Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/18/2018 at 07:38:26 (UTC).

PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC VS NILS TAYLOR

Case Summary

On 10/18/2017 PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against NILS TAYLOR. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Chatsworth Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is GRACIELA FREIXES. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******5100

  • Filing Date:

    10/18/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Chatsworth Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

GRACIELA FREIXES

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES LLC

Defendant

TAYLOR NILS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

COLLINS EMILY BLAKE

 

Court Documents

Order - Dismissal

2/7/2018: Order - Dismissal

Stipulation and Order

1/19/2018: Stipulation and Order

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

11/21/2017: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Business & Professions Code 6322.1(c)(1)

10/18/2017: Business & Professions Code 6322.1(c)(1)

Summons - on Complaint

10/18/2017: Summons - on Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet

10/18/2017: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint

10/18/2017: Complaint

Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service and Failure to File Default Judgment Pursuant

10/18/2017: Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service and Failure to File Default Judgment Pursuant

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

10/18/2017: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/21/2018
  • Order to Show Cause - Failure to File Proof of Service and Failure to File Default Judgment Pursuant to CRC 3.740 scheduled for 10/18/2018 at 08:30 AM in Chatsworth Courthouse at Department F43 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 02/21/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2018
  • Order - Dismissal; Signed and Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2018
  • Order for dismissal Without Prejudice entered as to entire action

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2018
  • The case is placed in special status of: Stay - Conditional Settlement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2018
  • Settlement Agreement Pursuant to CCP 664.6. Filed by: PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC (Plaintiff); As to: NILS TAYLOR (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2017
  • Proof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC (Plaintiff); As to: NILS TAYLOR (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 11/13/2017; Service Cost: 59.50; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2017
  • Case assigned to Hon. Graciela Freixes in Department F43 Chatsworth Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2017
  • Order to Show Cause - Failure to File Proof of Service and Failure to File Default Judgment Pursuant to CRC 3.740 scheduled for 10/18/2018 at 08:30 AM in Chatsworth Courthouse at Department F43

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2017
  • Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740); Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2017
  • Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2017
  • The case is placed in special status of: Collections Case (CCP 3.740)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2017
  • Complaint; Filed by: PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC (Plaintiff); As to: NILS TAYLOR (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2017
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2017
  • Summons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2017
  • Declaration Pursuant to 1033 CCP; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer COLLINS, EMILY B.