Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/23/2021 at 07:33:37 (UTC).

PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC VS NAOMI KARREN

Case Summary

On 03/18/2020 PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against NAOMI KARREN. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Chatsworth Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is GRACIELA FREIXES. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1386

  • Filing Date:

    03/18/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Chatsworth Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

GRACIELA FREIXES

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES LLC

Defendant

KARREN NAOMI

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

COOK JORDAN DAVID

 

Court Documents

Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

9/16/2020: Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment - Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

9/16/2020: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment - Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Declaration (name extension) - Declaration RE: 1) COMPLIANCE WITH CCP SECTION 1033(b)(2); 2) WAIVER OF ATTORNEY FEES

9/16/2020: Declaration (name extension) - Declaration RE: 1) COMPLIANCE WITH CCP SECTION 1033(b)(2); 2) WAIVER OF ATTORNEY FEES

Declaration (name extension) - Declaration OF CUSTODIAN OF RECORDS IN SUPPORT OF APPLICATION FOR ENTRY JUDGMENT PURSUANT TO CIVIL CODE SECTION 1788.60(a)

9/16/2020: Declaration (name extension) - Declaration OF CUSTODIAN OF RECORDS IN SUPPORT OF APPLICATION FOR ENTRY JUDGMENT PURSUANT TO CIVIL CODE SECTION 1788.60(a)

Default Judgment - Default Judgment

9/17/2020: Default Judgment - Default Judgment

Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

6/19/2020: Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

Summons - Summons on Complaint

3/18/2020: Summons - Summons on Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

3/18/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740) - Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740)

3/18/2020: Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740) - Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740)

Complaint - Complaint

3/18/2020: Complaint - Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

3/18/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/17/2020
  • DocketUpdated -- Default Judgment: Filed By: PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC (Plaintiff); Result: Granted; Result Date: 09/17/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2020
  • DocketDefault judgment by Court entered for Plaintiff PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC against Defendant NAOMI KARREN on the Complaint filed by PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC on 03/18/2020 for the principal amount of $6,126.35 and costs of $282.00 for a total of $6,408.35.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2020
  • DocketUpdated -- Default Judgment: Status Date changed from 09/16/2020 to 09/17/2020; Result Date changed from 09/17/2020 to 09/17/2020; As To Parties changed from NAOMI KARREN (Defendant) to NAOMI KARREN (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2020
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service and Failure to File Default Judgment Pursuant to CRC 3.740 scheduled for 03/24/2021 at 08:30 AM in Chatsworth Courthouse at Department F43 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 09/17/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2020
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default / Judgment; Filed by: PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC (Plaintiff); As to: NAOMI KARREN (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2020
  • DocketDeclaration RE: 1) COMPLIANCE WITH CCP SECTION 1033(b)(2); 2) WAIVER OF ATTORNEY FEES; Filed by: PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2020
  • DocketDeclaration OF CUSTODIAN OF RECORDS IN SUPPORT OF APPLICATION FOR ENTRY JUDGMENT PURSUANT TO CIVIL CODE SECTION 1788.60(a); Filed by: PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2020
  • DocketDefault entered as to NAOMI KARREN; On the Complaint filed by PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC on 03/18/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2020
  • DocketOn the Complaint filed by PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC on 03/18/2020, entered Request for Dismissal without prejudice filed by PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC, does 1-25

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2020
  • DocketDefault Judgment; Signed and Filed by: PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC (Plaintiff); As to: NAOMI KARREN (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2020
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC (Plaintiff); As to: NAOMI KARREN (Defendant); Service Date: 06/18/2020; Service Cost: 57.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2020
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service and Failure to File Default Judgment Pursuant to CRC 3.740 scheduled for 03/24/2021 at 08:30 AM in Chatsworth Courthouse at Department F43

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2020
  • DocketThe case is placed in special status of: Collections Case (CCP 3.740)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC (Plaintiff); As to: NAOMI KARREN (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2020
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC (Plaintiff); As to: NAOMI KARREN (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC (Plaintiff); As to: NAOMI KARREN (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2020
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740); Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Graciela Freixes in Department F43 Chatsworth Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer COOK JORDAN DAVID