Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/31/2019 at 04:49:17 (UTC).

PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC VS MONIQUE CAZAREZ

Case Summary

On 11/13/2017 PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against MONIQUE CAZAREZ. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Norwalk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is THOMAS D. LONG. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******8218

  • Filing Date:

    11/13/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Norwalk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

THOMAS D. LONG

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES LLC

Defendant

CAZAREZ MONIQUE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

FONG CATHERINE K.

 

Court Documents

Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740)

11/13/2017: Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740)

Proof of Personal Service

12/5/2017: Proof of Personal Service

Summons - on Complaint

11/13/2017: Summons - on Complaint

Declaration (name extension) - Application for entry judgment Pursuant to Civil Code 1788.60(B)

3/7/2018: Declaration (name extension) - Application for entry judgment Pursuant to Civil Code 1788.60(B)

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

11/13/2017: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

11/13/2017: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint

11/13/2017: Complaint

Declaration of Interest, Costs and Attorney Fees

3/7/2018: Declaration of Interest, Costs and Attorney Fees

Declaration in Support of Bus. & Prof. Code 6322.1(c)(1)

11/13/2017: Declaration in Support of Bus. & Prof. Code 6322.1(c)(1)

Judgment

4/17/2018: Judgment

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

3/7/2018: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/19/2018
  • Abstract of Judgment - Civil and Small Claims; Issued by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2018
  • Order to Show Cause - Failure to File Proof of Service and Failure to File Default Judgment Pursuant to CRC 3.740 scheduled for 11/13/2018 at 08:30 AM in Norwalk Courthouse at Department B Not Held - Vacated by Court on 04/20/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2018
  • Judgment; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2018
  • Default judgment entered for Plaintiff Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC against Defendant Monique Cazarez on the Complaint filed by Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC on 11/13/2017 for the principal amount of $3,128.89 and costs of $240.50 for a total of $3,369.39.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2018
  • Updated -- Judgment: Status changed from Filed to Signed and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2018
  • Request for Entry of Default / Judgment; Filed by: Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC (Plaintiff); As to: Monique Cazarez (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2018
  • Default entered as to Monique Cazarez; On the Complaint filed by Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC on 11/13/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2018
  • Declaration Application for entry judgment Pursuant to Civil Code 1788.60(B); Filed by: Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2018
  • Declaration of Interest, Costs and Attorney Fees; Filed by: Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2017
  • Proof of Personal Service; Filed by: Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC (Plaintiff); As to: Monique Cazarez (Defendant); Service Date: 12/01/2017; Service Cost: 59.50; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2017
  • Case assigned to Hon. Thomas D. Long in Department B Norwalk Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2017
  • Order to Show Cause - Failure to File Proof of Service and Failure to File Default Judgment Pursuant to CRC 3.740 scheduled for 11/13/2018 at 08:30 AM in Norwalk Courthouse at Department B

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2017
  • Complaint; Filed by: Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC (Plaintiff); As to: Monique Cazarez (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2017
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2017
  • Summons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2017
  • Declaration Pursuant to 1033 CCP; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2017
  • Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740); Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2017
  • Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2017
  • The case is placed in special status of: Collections Case (CCP 3.740)

    Read MoreRead Less