Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 12/12/2020 at 00:12:13 (UTC).

PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES LLC VS MIGUEL CASTILLO

Case Summary

On 12/05/2019 PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against MIGUEL CASTILLO. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Norwalk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is ANN H. PARK. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******7094

  • Filing Date:

    12/05/2019

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Norwalk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

ANN H. PARK

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES LLC

Defendant

CASTILLO MIGUEL

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

DIPIERO ANTHONY

 

Court Documents

Minute Order - Minute Order (Court Order)

6/17/2020: Minute Order - Minute Order (Court Order)

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of 06/17/2020

6/17/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of 06/17/2020

Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

11/24/2020: Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740) - Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740)

12/5/2019: Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740) - Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740)

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

12/5/2019: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

Declaration in Support of Bus. & Prof. Code 6322.1(c)(1) - Declaration in Support of Bus. & Prof. Code 6322.1(c)(1)

12/5/2019: Declaration in Support of Bus. & Prof. Code 6322.1(c)(1) - Declaration in Support of Bus. & Prof. Code 6322.1(c)(1)

Summons - Summons on Complaint

12/5/2019: Summons - Summons on Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

12/5/2019: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

Complaint - Complaint

12/5/2019: Complaint - Complaint

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/24/2020
  • DocketOn the Complaint filed by Portfolio Recovery Associates LLC on 12/05/2019, entered Request for Dismissal without prejudice filed by Portfolio Recovery Associates LLC as to the entire action

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2020
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service and Failure to File Default Judgment Pursuant to CRC 3.740 scheduled for 12/20/2021 at 08:30 AM in Norwalk Courthouse at Department A Not Held - Vacated by Court on 11/24/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2020
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service and Failure to File Default Judgment Pursuant to CRC 3.740 scheduled for 12/20/2021 at 08:30 AM in Norwalk Courthouse at Department A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2020
  • DocketMinute Order (Court Order)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of 06/17/2020; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2020
  • DocketOn the Court's own motion, Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service and Failure to File Default Judgment Pursuant to CRC 3.740 scheduled for 12/10/2020 at 08:30 AM in Norwalk Courthouse at Department A Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court was rescheduled to 12/20/2021 08:30 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Portfolio Recovery Associates LLC (Plaintiff); As to: MIGUEL CASTILLO (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • DocketDeclaration in Support of Bus. & Prof. Code 6322.1(c)(1); Filed by: Portfolio Recovery Associates LLC (Plaintiff); As to: MIGUEL CASTILLO (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Portfolio Recovery Associates LLC (Plaintiff); As to: MIGUEL CASTILLO (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Portfolio Recovery Associates LLC (Plaintiff); As to: MIGUEL CASTILLO (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740); Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service and Failure to File Default Judgment Pursuant to CRC 3.740 scheduled for 12/10/2020 at 08:30 AM in Norwalk Courthouse at Department A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • DocketThe case is placed in special status of: Collections Case (CCP 3.740)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Ann H. Park in Department A Norwalk Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less