Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 12/12/2020 at 01:56:17 (UTC).

PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES LLC VS CRISTINA ANGUIANO

Case Summary

On 12/05/2019 PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against CRISTINA ANGUIANO. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Norwalk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is ANN H. PARK. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******7403

  • Filing Date:

    12/05/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Norwalk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

ANN H. PARK

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES LLC

Defendant

ANGUIANO CRISTINA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

DIPIERO ANTHONY

 

Court Documents

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of 06/17/2020

6/17/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of 06/17/2020

Minute Order - Minute Order (Court Order)

6/17/2020: Minute Order - Minute Order (Court Order)

Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

12/30/2019: Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

Summons - Summons on Complaint

12/5/2019: Summons - Summons on Complaint

Complaint - Complaint

12/5/2019: Complaint - Complaint

Declaration in Support of Bus. & Prof. Code 6322.1(c)(1) - Declaration in Support of Bus. & Prof. Code 6322.1(c)(1)

12/5/2019: Declaration in Support of Bus. & Prof. Code 6322.1(c)(1) - Declaration in Support of Bus. & Prof. Code 6322.1(c)(1)

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

12/5/2019: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

12/5/2019: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740) - Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740)

12/5/2019: Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740) - Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740)

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/20/2021
  • Hearing12/20/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department A at 12720 Norwalk Blvd., Norwalk, CA 90650; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service and Failure to File Default Judgment Pursuant to CRC 3.740

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2020
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service and Failure to File Default Judgment Pursuant to CRC 3.740 scheduled for 12/20/2021 at 08:30 AM in Norwalk Courthouse at Department A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2020
  • DocketMinute Order (Court Order)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of 06/17/2020; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2020
  • DocketOn the Court's own motion, Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service and Failure to File Default Judgment Pursuant to CRC 3.740 scheduled for 12/10/2020 at 08:30 AM in Norwalk Courthouse at Department A Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court was rescheduled to 12/20/2021 08:30 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2019
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: Portfolio Recovery Associates LLC (Plaintiff); As to: CRISTINA ANGUIANO (Defendant); Service Date: 12/26/2019; Service Cost: 65.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service and Failure to File Default Judgment Pursuant to CRC 3.740 scheduled for 12/10/2020 at 08:30 AM in Norwalk Courthouse at Department A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Ann H. Park in Department A Norwalk Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Portfolio Recovery Associates LLC (Plaintiff); As to: CRISTINA ANGUIANO (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • DocketDeclaration in Support of Bus. & Prof. Code 6322.1(c)(1); Filed by: Portfolio Recovery Associates LLC (Plaintiff); As to: CRISTINA ANGUIANO (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Portfolio Recovery Associates LLC (Plaintiff); As to: CRISTINA ANGUIANO (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Portfolio Recovery Associates LLC (Plaintiff); As to: CRISTINA ANGUIANO (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740); Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • DocketThe case is placed in special status of: Collections Case (CCP 3.740)

    Read MoreRead Less