This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/08/2019 at 00:46:54 (UTC).

PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCAITES VS GIBSON, TAMEKA RUNNELS

Case Summary

On 03/08/2017 PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCAITES filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against GIBSON, TAMEKA RUNNELS. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Norwalk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is THOMAS D. LONG. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****4637

  • Filing Date:

    03/08/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Norwalk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

THOMAS D. LONG

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCAITES LLC

PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES LLC

Defendant

GIBSON TAMEKA RUNNELS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

ATTORNEY AT LAW - JORDAN D. COOK ESQ

Attorney at ATTORNEY AT LAW

COOK JORDAN D. ESQ

 

Court Documents

Complaint

3/8/2017: Complaint

Summons

3/8/2017: Summons

Civil Case Cover Sheet

3/8/2017: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Declaration (name extension) - Under Business and Professions Code 6322.1

3/8/2017: Declaration (name extension) - Under Business and Professions Code 6322.1

Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740)

3/14/2017: Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740)

Proof of Service (Legacy) - PROOF OF SERVICE RE: SUMMONS; COMPLAINT FILED. SERVED AS TO (GIBSON, TAMEKA RUNNELS) ON 4/15/2017 . COSTS OF $ 60.00

4/19/2017: Proof of Service (Legacy) - PROOF OF SERVICE RE: SUMMONS; COMPLAINT FILED. SERVED AS TO (GIBSON, TAMEKA RUNNELS) ON 4/15/2017 . COSTS OF $ 60.00

Answer

5/11/2017: Answer

Notice of Trial - Non-Jury

5/11/2017: Notice of Trial - Non-Jury

Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment

6/1/2017: Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment

Trial Brief

4/2/2018: Trial Brief

Notice (name extension)

4/2/2018: Notice (name extension)

Exhibit List

4/2/2018: Exhibit List

Witness List

4/2/2018: Witness List

Proof of Service by Mail

4/2/2018: Proof of Service by Mail

Stipulation for the Appointment of Court Commissioner as Temporary Judge

5/11/2018: Stipulation for the Appointment of Court Commissioner as Temporary Judge

Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)

5/11/2018: Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)

Notice of Settlement

7/30/2018: Notice of Settlement

Order to Show Cause re: Dismissal (Settlement)

8/6/2018: Order to Show Cause re: Dismissal (Settlement)

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/23/2019
  • Order to Show Cause - Hearing re: Dismissal Date scheduled for 04/30/2019 at 08:30 AM in Norwalk Courthouse at Department A Not Held - Vacated by Court on 04/23/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2018
  • Order to Show Cause re: Dismissal (Settlement); Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2018
  • Order to Show Cause - Hearing re: Dismissal Date scheduled for 04/30/2019 at 08:30 AM in Norwalk Courthouse at Department A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2018
  • Order to Show Cause re: Dismissal (Settlement) scheduled for 08/15/2018 at 08:30 AM in Norwalk Courthouse at Department A Not Held - Vacated by Court on 08/06/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2018
  • Notice of Settlement; Filed by: (PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC) (Plaintiff); Settlement Type: Conditional; OSC re: Dismissal Date: 04/30/19; Vacate Future Dates: Yes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2018
  • Stipulation for the Appointment of Court Commissioner as Temporary Judge; Filed by:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2018
  • Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2018
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 05/11/2018 at 08:30 AM in Norwalk Courthouse at Department B updated: Result Date to 05/11/2018; Result Type to Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2018
  • Order to Show Cause re: Dismissal (Settlement) scheduled for 08/15/2018 at 08:30 AM in Norwalk Courthouse at Department B

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2018
  • Order for dismissal Without Prejudice entered as to entire action , pursuant to 664.6

    Read MoreRead Less
11 More Docket Entries
  • 05/11/2017
  • NOTICE OF COURT TRIAL FILED AND MAILED TO RESPECTIVE PARTIES/COUNSEL. CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2017
  • REQUEST TO WAIVE COURT FEES FILED BY (GIBSON, TAMEKA RUNNELS) .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2017
  • ORDER GRANTING REQUEST TO WAIVE COURT FEES SIGNED AND FILED AS TO (GIBSON, TAMEKA RUNNELS) .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2017
  • PROOF OF SERVICE RE: SUMMONS; COMPLAINT FILED. SERVED AS TO (GIBSON, TAMEKA RUNNELS) ON 4/15/2017 . COSTS OF $ 60.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2017
  • OSC HEARING IS SET FOR 02/21/20 AT 08:30A M., IN DEPARTMENT SEB . ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING SIGNED AND FILED BY THOMAS D. LONG, JUDGE TO SHOW WHY SANCTIONS SHOULD NOT BE IMPOSED FOR FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE AND FAILURE TO FILE DEFAULT JUDGMENT PURSUANT TO CRC 3.740. CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2017
  • COLLECTIONS CASE COMPLAINT FILED PURSUANT TO CRC 3.740. RN NOR624914029. Filing Fee: 181.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2017
  • SUMMONS ISSUED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2017
  • SUMMONS FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2017
  • DECLARATION UNDER BUSINESS AND PROFESSIONS CODE 6322.1 FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2017
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: (PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCAITES LLC) (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less