This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/20/2019 at 15:51:42 (UTC).

PORSCHIA HICKS VS KHASIJAH ZARINAH ZAKIYYAH ALI

Case Summary

On 10/12/2017 PORSCHIA HICKS filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against KHASIJAH ZARINAH ZAKIYYAH ALI. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is GEORGINA T. RIZK. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******4348

  • Filing Date:

    10/12/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

GEORGINA T. RIZK

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

HICKS PORSCHIA

Defendant

ZAKIYYAH ALI KHASIJAH ZARINAH

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SIMON ROBERT STANLEY

 

Court Documents

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial) of 04/11/2019

4/11/2019: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial) of 04/11/2019

Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

4/11/2019: Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

Summons - on Complaint

10/12/2017: Summons - on Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet

10/12/2017: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint

10/12/2017: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

10/12/2017: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/11/2019
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 10/15/2020 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 94 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 07/11/2019

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/11/2019
  • DocketOn the Complaint filed by Porschia Hicks on 10/12/2017, entered Order for Dismissal without prejudice as to the entire action

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/11/2019
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 04/11/2019 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 94 updated: Result Date to 04/11/2019; Result Type to Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/11/2019
  • DocketMinute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/11/2019
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial) of 04/11/2019; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/16/2017
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Georgina T. Rizk in Department 77 Stanley Mosk Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/16/2017
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 04/11/2019 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 77

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/16/2017
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 10/15/2020 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 77

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/12/2017
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Porschia Hicks (Plaintiff); As to: Khasijah Zarinah Zakiyyah Ali (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/12/2017
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Porschia Hicks (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/12/2017
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/12/2017
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer SIMON ROBERT STANLEY ESQ.