This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/24/2020 at 09:31:38 (UTC).

POOL AND SPA BUILDERS, INC. VS DESIGNING EDGE BUILDERS, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 03/18/2020 POOL AND SPA BUILDERS, INC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against DESIGNING EDGE BUILDERS, INC , A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is JAMES E. BLANCARTE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2980

  • Filing Date:

    03/18/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

JAMES E. BLANCARTE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

POOL AND SPA BUILDERS INC.

Defendants

SURETEC INDEMNITY COMPANY

DESIGNING EDGE BUILDERS INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

SAUER DOMINIQUE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LUBIN MICHAEL CRAIG

Defendant Attorney

KHALILPOUR MAHBOD

 

Court Documents

Notice (name extension) - Notice of incorrect case number

4/3/2020: Notice (name extension) - Notice of incorrect case number

First Amended Standing Order - First Amended Standing Order

3/18/2020: First Amended Standing Order - First Amended Standing Order

Complaint - Complaint

3/18/2020: Complaint - Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

3/18/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - Summons on Complaint

3/18/2020: Summons - Summons on Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

3/18/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

4/8/2020: Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Mailing (Substituted Service) - Proof of Mailing (Substituted Service)

4/8/2020: Proof of Mailing (Substituted Service) - Proof of Mailing (Substituted Service)

Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

4/8/2020: Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

Answer - Answer

4/22/2020: Answer - Answer

Answer - Answer

4/21/2020: Answer - Answer

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/22/2023
  • Hearing03/22/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 25 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2021
  • Hearing09/15/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department 25 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2020
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by: Designing Edge Builders, Inc., a California Corporation (Defendant); Dominique Sauer (Defendant); As to: Pool and Spa Builders, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2020
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by: Suretec Indemnity Company, (Defendant); As to: Pool and Spa Builders, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2020
  • DocketProof of Mailing (Substituted Service); Filed by: Pool and Spa Builders, Inc. (Plaintiff); As to: Dominique Sauer (Defendant); Mailing Date: 03/23/2020; Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2020
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: Pool and Spa Builders, Inc. (Plaintiff); As to: Suretec Indemnity Company, (Defendant); Service Date: 03/26/2020; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2020
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: Pool and Spa Builders, Inc. (Plaintiff); As to: Designing Edge Builders, Inc., a California Corporation (Defendant); Service Date: 03/25/2020; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2020
  • DocketUpdated -- Complaint: As To Parties changed from Designing Edge Builders, Inc., a California Corporation (Defendant), Suretec Indemnity Company, (Defendant), Dominique Sauer (Defendant) to Designing Edge Builders, Inc., a California Corporation (Defendant), Dominique Sauer (Defendant), Suretec Indemnity Company, (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2020
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 03/22/2023 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2020
  • DocketNotice of incorrect case number; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2020
  • DocketUpdated -- Notice of incorrect case number: As To Parties: removed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. James E. Blancarte in Department 25 Spring Street Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2020
  • DocketUpdated -- Civil Case Cover Sheet: As To Parties: removed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2020
  • DocketUpdated -- Summons on Complaint: As To Parties: removed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2020
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 09/15/2021 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Pool and Spa Builders, Inc. (Plaintiff); As to: Designing Edge Builders, Inc., a California Corporation (Defendant); Dominique Sauer (Defendant); Suretec Indemnity Company, (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Pool and Spa Builders, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2020
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2020
  • DocketFirst Amended Standing Order; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where DESIGNING EDGE BUILDERS INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where SURETEC INDEMNITY COMPANY A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer LUBIN MICHAEL CRAIG