This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/27/2019 at 17:53:25 (UTC).

POLLAND, RAE VS BEUZIERON, LILO

Case Summary

On 06/08/2012 POLLAND, RAE filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against BEUZIERON, LILO. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Chatsworth Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****5554

  • Filing Date:

    06/08/2012

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Courthouse:

    Chatsworth Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

POLLAND RAE

ROJTMAN DANIELLE ARRONSON

TRUSTEES OF THE AARON POLAND TRUST

Defendants

BEUZIERON LILO

HIBLER DOUGLAS H

HIBLER DOUGLAS H AKA HIBLER HARRY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

SPENCER, RANDALL ALAN

SPENCER RANDALL ALAN

Defendant Attorneys

OLESK, JAAK

OLESK JAAK

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/09/2017
  • DocketSTATUS CONFERENCE HELD, MINUTE ORDER FILED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/09/2017
  • DocketSTATUS CONFERENCE HELD, MINUTE ORDER FILED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/09/2017
  • DocketRESTORED CASE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/09/2017
  • DocketORDER OF DISMISSAL BY COURT'S MOTION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/11/2014
  • DocketOSC CONTINUED TO 06/09/17 AT 08:30 AM IN DEPT F43

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/11/2014
  • DocketOSC CONTINUED TO 06/09/17 AT 08:30 AM IN DEPT F43

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/17/2013
  • DocketOSC SET 12/11/14, 0830 AM, DEPT. F43, NOTICE FILED & MAILED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/17/2013
  • DocketINACTIVE CASE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/15/2013
  • Docket******NOTICE OF CONDITIONAL SETTLEMENT OF ENTIRE CASE FILED BY ******NOTICE OF CONDITIONAL SETTLEMENT OF ENTIRE CASE FILED BY PLAINTIFF******

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/15/2013
  • Docket*************NOTICE OF CONDITIONAL SETTLEMENT********************** *************NOTICE OF CONDITIONAL SETTLEMENT**********************

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
12 More Docket Entries
  • 08/29/2012
  • DocketRESPONSE FILED - ANSWER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/29/2012
  • DocketA/C - ANSWER FILING REASON: OTHERS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/17/2012
  • DocketSUBMISSION FOR DEFAULT ONLY PENDING *** DEFAULT PROCESSE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/17/2012
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DEFAULT FILED AND NOT ENTERED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/17/2012
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE TO COMPLAINT FILED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/28/2012
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE TO COMPLAINT FILED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/28/2012
  • DocketSUB SERV: 6-19-12; DEC DILIGENCE ATTACHED; MAILED: 6-20-12

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/13/2012
  • DocketCMR SET 12/10/12, 0830 AM, DEPT. 108, NOTICE FILED & MAILED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/08/2012
  • DocketSUMMONS FILED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/08/2012
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FILED - COLLECTION CASE Filing Fee: 370.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less