This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 02/12/2022 at 12:38:49 (UTC).

POINT MEDIA VS MICHAEL FRANZESE

Case Summary

On 12/15/2017 POINT MEDIA filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against MICHAEL FRANZESE. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is GEORGINA T. RIZK. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******5551

  • Filing Date:

    12/15/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

GEORGINA T. RIZK

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

POINT MEDIA A LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

Defendant

FRANZESE MICHAEL

 

Court Documents

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

12/15/2017: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

Complaint

12/15/2017: Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet

12/15/2017: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - on Complaint

12/15/2017: Summons - on Complaint

Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

12/14/2018: Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

Other - (name extension) - Other - STATEMENT OF THE CASE

12/14/2018: Other - (name extension) - Other - STATEMENT OF THE CASE

Judgment - Judgment - Default Judgment By Court - Before Trial - 12/14/2018 entered for Plaintiff Point Media, a limited liability company against Defendant Michael Franzese.

12/14/2018: Judgment - Judgment - Default Judgment By Court - Before Trial - 12/14/2018 entered for Plaintiff Point Media, a limited liability company against Defendant Michael Franzese.

Declaration Pursuant to 585 CCP in Support of Default Judgment - Declaration Pursuant to 585 CCP in Support of Default Judgment

12/14/2018: Declaration Pursuant to 585 CCP in Support of Default Judgment - Declaration Pursuant to 585 CCP in Support of Default Judgment

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

5/31/2018: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment

5/24/2018: Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

5/16/2018: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment

5/10/2018: Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

4/19/2018: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

2/16/2018: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Substitution of Attorney - Substitution of Attorney

7/3/2019: Substitution of Attorney - Substitution of Attorney

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/03/2019
  • DocketSubstitution of Attorney; Filed by: Point Media, a limited liability company (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/19/2018
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 06/14/2019 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 94 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 12/19/2018

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/19/2018
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 12/18/2020 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 94 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 12/19/2018

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/14/2018
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by: Point Media, a limited liability company (Plaintiff); As to: Does: 1-20, inclusive only

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/14/2018
  • DocketOn the Complaint filed by Point Media on 12/15/2017, entered Request for Dismissal without prejudice filed by Point Media, a limited liability company, does 1-20, inclusive only

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/14/2018
  • DocketJudgment - Default Judgment By Court - Before Trial - 12/14/2018 entered for Plaintiff Point Media, a limited liability company against Defendant Michael Franzese. Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/14/2018
  • DocketDefault judgment by Court entered for Plaintiff Point Media, a limited liability company against Defendant Michael Franzese on the Complaint filed by Point Media on 12/15/2017 for damages of $21,500.00 and costs of $434.50 for a total of $21,934.50.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/14/2018
  • DocketDeclaration Pursuant to 585 CCP in Support of Default Judgment; Filed by: Point Media, a limited liability company (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/14/2018
  • DocketOther - STATEMENT OF THE CASE; Filed by: Point Media, a limited liability company (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/31/2018
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default / Judgment; Filed by: Point Media, a limited liability company (Plaintiff); As to: Michael Franzese (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
7 More Docket Entries
  • 04/19/2018
  • Docket; Default not entered as to Michael Franzese; On the Complaint filed by Point Media on 12/15/2017

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/16/2018
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: Point Media (Plaintiff); As to: Michael Franzese (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 02/14/18; Service Cost: 64.50; Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/19/2017
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/19/2017
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Georgina T. Rizk in Department 77 Stanley Mosk Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/19/2017
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 06/14/2019 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 77

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/19/2017
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 12/18/2020 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 77

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/15/2017
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Point Media (Plaintiff); As to: Michael Franzese (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/15/2017
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Point Media (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/15/2017
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/15/2017
  • DocketUpdated -- Summons on Complaint: Status Date changed from 12/19/2017 to 12/15/2017; Name Extension changed from on Complaint to on Complaint

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less