This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/28/2021 at 12:28:00 (UTC).

PLAYA ADVANCE SURGICAL INSTITUTE, LLC VS GORDANA GEHLHAUSEN

Case Summary

On 03/13/2020 PLAYA ADVANCE SURGICAL INSTITUTE, LLC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against GORDANA GEHLHAUSEN. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Van Nuys Courthouse East located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is RICHARD F. WALMARK. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1179

  • Filing Date:

    03/13/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Courthouse:

    Van Nuys Courthouse East

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

RICHARD F. WALMARK

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PLAYA ADVANCE SURGICAL INSTITUTE LLC

Defendant

GEHLHAUSEN GORDANA

 

Court Documents

Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims) - Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims) Michael Goldman, appearing for plaintiff

11/9/2020: Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims) - Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims) Michael Goldman, appearing for plaintiff

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for Notice of Remote Appearances and Exchange and Submission of Evidence Protocol

10/13/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for Notice of Remote Appearances and Exchange and Submission of Evidence Protocol

Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

10/16/2020: Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Proof of Mailing (Substituted Service) - Proof of Mailing (Substituted Service) Notice of Continuance due to COVID -19 -Gordana Gehlhausen

10/16/2020: Proof of Mailing (Substituted Service) - Proof of Mailing (Substituted Service) Notice of Continuance due to COVID -19 -Gordana Gehlhausen

Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

10/22/2020: Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims) - Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)

11/9/2020: Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims) - Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Non-Jury Trial) of 11/09/2020

11/9/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Non-Jury Trial) of 11/09/2020

Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

11/9/2020: Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

Other - (name extension) - Other - Defendant's Claim-Page 1 Only

6/15/2020: Other - (name extension) - Other - Defendant's Claim-Page 1 Only

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of 06/15/2020

6/15/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of 06/15/2020

Plaintiff's Claim Cover Sheet (Postponement Before Service) - Plaintiff's Claim Cover Sheet (Postponement Before Service)

6/15/2020: Plaintiff's Claim Cover Sheet (Postponement Before Service) - Plaintiff's Claim Cover Sheet (Postponement Before Service)

Minute Order - Minute Order (Court Order)

6/15/2020: Minute Order - Minute Order (Court Order)

Defendant's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court (Small Claims) - Defendant's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court (Small Claims)

5/26/2020: Defendant's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court (Small Claims) - Defendant's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court (Small Claims)

Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court - Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

3/13/2020: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court - Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

Plaintiff's Claim Cover Sheet (Postponement Before Service) - Plaintiff's Claim Cover Sheet (Postponement Before Service)

4/2/2020: Plaintiff's Claim Cover Sheet (Postponement Before Service) - Plaintiff's Claim Cover Sheet (Postponement Before Service)

Minute Order - Minute Order (Court Order)

4/2/2020: Minute Order - Minute Order (Court Order)

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for [Minute Order (Court Order), Plaintiff's Claim Cover Sheet (Postponement Before Service)]

4/2/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for [Minute Order (Court Order), Plaintiff's Claim Cover Sheet (Postponement Before Service)]

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/09/2020
  • DocketCourt orders judgment entered on the Plaintiff's Claim filed by PLAYA ADVANCE SURGICAL INSTITUTE, LLC on 03/13/2020 as follows: Defendant GORDANA GEHLHAUSEN does not owe the plaintiff PLAYA ADVANCE SURGICAL INSTITUTE, LLC any money on plaintiff's claim.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2020
  • DocketCourt orders judgment entered on the Defendant's Claim filed by GORDANA GEHLHAUSEN on 05/26/2020 as follows: Plaintiff PLAYA ADVANCE SURGICAL INSTITUTE, LLC does not owe the defendant GORDANA GEHLHAUSEN any money on defendant's claim.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2020
  • DocketAuthorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims) Michael Goldman, appearing for plaintiff; Filed by: PLAYA ADVANCE SURGICAL INSTITUTE, LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2020
  • DocketMinute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for (Non-Jury Trial) of 11/09/2020; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2020
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims); Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2020
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 11/09/2020 at 08:30 AM in Van Nuys Courthouse East at Department P updated: Result Date to 11/09/2020; Result Type to Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2020
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: GORDANA GEHLHAUSEN (Defendant on defendant's claim); As to: PLAYA ADVANCE SURGICAL INSTITUTE, LLC (Plaintiff on defendant's claim); Proof of Mailing Date: 10/20/2020; Service Cost: 0.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2020
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: PLAYA ADVANCE SURGICAL INSTITUTE, LLC (Plaintiff); As to: GORDANA GEHLHAUSEN (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 03/28/2020; Service Cost: 55.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2020
  • DocketProof of Mailing (Substituted Service) Notice of Continuance due to COVID -19 -Gordana Gehlhausen; Filed by: PLAYA ADVANCE SURGICAL INSTITUTE, LLC (Plaintiff); Mailing Date: 09/14/2020; Service Cost: 0.00; Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
7 More Docket Entries
  • 06/15/2020
  • DocketOn the Court's own motion, Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 07/08/2020 at 08:30 AM in Van Nuys Courthouse East at Department P Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court was rescheduled to 11/09/2020 08:30 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2020
  • DocketDefendant's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court (Small Claims); Filed by: GORDANA GEHLHAUSEN (Defendant on defendant's claim); As to: PLAYA ADVANCE SURGICAL INSTITUTE, LLC (Plaintiff on defendant's claim)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2020
  • DocketPlaintiff's Claim Cover Sheet (Postponement Before Service); Issued and Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for [Minute Order (Court Order), Plaintiff's Claim Cover Sheet (Postponement Before Service)]; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2020
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 07/08/2020 at 08:30 AM in Van Nuys Courthouse East at Department P

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2020
  • DocketMinute Order (Court Order)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2020
  • DocketOn the Court's own motion, Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 05/06/2020 at 08:30 AM in Van Nuys Courthouse East at Department P Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court was rescheduled to 07/08/2020 08:30 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2020
  • DocketPlaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court; Filed by: PLAYA ADVANCE SURGICAL INSTITUTE, LLC (Plaintiff); As to: GORDANA GEHLHAUSEN (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Richard F. Walmark in Department P Van Nuys Courthouse East

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2020
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 05/06/2020 at 08:30 AM in Van Nuys Courthouse East at Department P

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where PLAYA ADVANCE SURGICAL INSTITUTE LLC is a litigant