This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/28/2021 at 12:28:17 (UTC).

PLAYA ADVANCE SURGICAL INSTITUTE, LLC VS DANA SEEMAN

Case Summary

On 03/13/2020 PLAYA ADVANCE SURGICAL INSTITUTE, LLC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against DANA SEEMAN. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Van Nuys Courthouse East located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is RICHARD F. WALMARK. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1181

  • Filing Date:

    03/13/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Courthouse:

    Van Nuys Courthouse East

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

RICHARD F. WALMARK

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PLAYA ADVANCE SURGICAL INSTITUTE LLC

Defendant

SEEMAN DANA

 

Court Documents

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for [Notice of Remote Appearances and Exchange and Submission of Evidence Protocol]

10/13/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for [Notice of Remote Appearances and Exchange and Submission of Evidence Protocol]

Proof of Mailing (Substituted Service) - Proof of Mailing (Substituted Service) Notice of Continuance due to COVID-19 dated 06/15/2020 - Dana Seeman

10/16/2020: Proof of Mailing (Substituted Service) - Proof of Mailing (Substituted Service) Notice of Continuance due to COVID-19 dated 06/15/2020 - Dana Seeman

Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

10/16/2020: Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

11/9/2020: Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

11/9/2020: Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for [Minute Order (Court Order), Plaintiff's Claim Cover Sheet (Postponement Before Service)]

6/15/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for [Minute Order (Court Order), Plaintiff's Claim Cover Sheet (Postponement Before Service)]

Plaintiff's Claim Cover Sheet (Postponement Before Service) - Plaintiff's Claim Cover Sheet (Postponement Before Service)

6/15/2020: Plaintiff's Claim Cover Sheet (Postponement Before Service) - Plaintiff's Claim Cover Sheet (Postponement Before Service)

Minute Order - Minute Order (Court Order)

6/15/2020: Minute Order - Minute Order (Court Order)

Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court - Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

3/13/2020: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court - Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

Minute Order - Minute Order (Court Order)

4/2/2020: Minute Order - Minute Order (Court Order)

Plaintiff's Claim Cover Sheet (Postponement Before Service) - Plaintiff's Claim Cover Sheet (Postponement Before Service)

4/2/2020: Plaintiff's Claim Cover Sheet (Postponement Before Service) - Plaintiff's Claim Cover Sheet (Postponement Before Service)

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for [Minute Order (Court Order), Plaintiff's Claim Cover Sheet (Postponement Before Service)]

4/2/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for [Minute Order (Court Order), Plaintiff's Claim Cover Sheet (Postponement Before Service)]

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/09/2020
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by: PLAYA ADVANCE SURGICAL INSTITUTE, LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2020
  • DocketOn the Plaintiff's Claim filed by PLAYA ADVANCE SURGICAL INSTITUTE, LLC on 03/13/2020, entered Request for Dismissal without prejudice filed by PLAYA ADVANCE SURGICAL INSTITUTE, LLC as to the entire action

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2020
  • DocketMinute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2020
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 11/09/2020 at 08:30 AM in Van Nuys Courthouse East at Department P Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Party on 11/09/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2020
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: PLAYA ADVANCE SURGICAL INSTITUTE, LLC (Plaintiff); As to: DANA SEEMAN (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 03/20/2020; Service Cost: 55.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2020
  • DocketProof of Mailing (Substituted Service) Notice of Continuance due to COVID-19 dated 06/15/2020 - Dana Seeman; Filed by: PLAYA ADVANCE SURGICAL INSTITUTE, LLC (Plaintiff); Mailing Date: 09/14/2020; Service Cost: 0.00; Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2020
  • DocketNotice of Remote Appearances and Exchange and Submission of Evidence Protocol; Filed by: Clerk; As to: PLAYA ADVANCE SURGICAL INSTITUTE, LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for [Notice of Remote Appearances and Exchange and Submission of Evidence Protocol]; Issued and Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for [Minute Order (Court Order), Plaintiff's Claim Cover Sheet (Postponement Before Service)]; Signed and Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2020
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 11/09/2020 at 08:30 AM in Van Nuys Courthouse East at Department P

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 06/15/2020
  • DocketOn the Court's own motion, Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 07/08/2020 at 08:30 AM in Van Nuys Courthouse East at Department P Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court was rescheduled to 11/09/2020 08:30 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2020
  • DocketPlaintiff's Claim Cover Sheet (Postponement Before Service); Issued and Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2020
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 07/08/2020 at 08:30 AM in Van Nuys Courthouse East at Department P

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2020
  • DocketPlaintiff's Claim Cover Sheet (Postponement Before Service); Issued and Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for [Minute Order (Court Order), Plaintiff's Claim Cover Sheet (Postponement Before Service)]; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2020
  • DocketMinute Order (Court Order)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2020
  • DocketOn the Court's own motion, Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 05/06/2020 at 08:30 AM in Van Nuys Courthouse East at Department P Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court was rescheduled to 07/08/2020 08:30 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2020
  • DocketPlaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court; Filed by: PLAYA ADVANCE SURGICAL INSTITUTE, LLC (Plaintiff); As to: DANA SEEMAN (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Richard F. Walmark in Department P Van Nuys Courthouse East

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2020
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 05/06/2020 at 08:30 AM in Van Nuys Courthouse East at Department P

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where PLAYA ADVANCE SURGICAL INSTITUTE LLC is a litigant