This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/15/2019 at 00:44:24 (UTC).

PINEDA INVESTMENTS, INC. VS GABRIEL VARGAS BENAVIDEZ

Case Summary

On 09/10/2018 PINEDA INVESTMENTS, INC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against GABRIEL VARGAS BENAVIDEZ. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Bellflower Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******4601

  • Filing Date:

    09/10/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Bellflower Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PINEDA INVESTMENTS INC.

8709 Maple St

Bellflower, CA 90706

Defendant

VARGAS BENAVIDEZ GABRIEL DBA GABRIEL VARGAS CONSTRUCTION

Norwalk, CA 90650

 

Court Documents

Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

3/20/2019: Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

Notice (name extension) - E-Filing Receipt of Documents

9/10/2018: Notice (name extension) - E-Filing Receipt of Documents

Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

9/10/2018: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for [Notice Small Claims Reassignment]

1/2/2019: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for [Notice Small Claims Reassignment]

Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims) - Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims)

11/26/2018: Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims) - Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims)

Notice (name extension) - E-Filing Payment Due

9/10/2018: Notice (name extension) - E-Filing Payment Due

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial) of 03/20/2019 and Judgment Debtor Statement of Assets

3/20/2019: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial) of 03/20/2019 and Judgment Debtor Statement of Assets

Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

11/26/2018: Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

3/5/2019: Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims) - Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)

3/20/2019: Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims) - Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)

Notice (name extension) - Notice Small Claims Reassignment

1/2/2019: Notice (name extension) - Notice Small Claims Reassignment

Plaintiff's Claim Cover Sheet (Postponement Before Service) - Plaintiff's Claim Cover Sheet (Postponement Before Service)

9/10/2018: Plaintiff's Claim Cover Sheet (Postponement Before Service) - Plaintiff's Claim Cover Sheet (Postponement Before Service)

Writ of Execution - Writ of Execution (Los Angeles)

4/23/2019: Writ of Execution - Writ of Execution (Los Angeles)

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/23/2019
  • DocketWrit of Execution (Los Angeles); Filed by: County: Los Angeles; Principal: 4,050.00; Interest: 0.00; Costs: 0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2019
  • DocketCourt orders judgment entered for Plaintiff Pineda Investments, Inc. against Defendant Gabriel Vargas Benavidez DBA Gabriel Vargas Construction on the Plaintiff's Claim filed by Pineda Investments, Inc. on 09/10/2018 for the principal amount of $4,000.00 and costs of $50.00 for a total of $4,050.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2019
  • DocketMinute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2019
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial) of 03/20/2019 and Judgment Debtor Statement of Assets; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2019
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims); Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2019
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 03/20/2019 at 08:30 AM in Bellflower Courthouse at Department 1 updated: Result Date to 03/20/2019; Result Type to Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2019
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: Pineda Investments, Inc. (Plaintiff); As to: Gabriel Vargas Benavidez (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 02/11/2019; Service Cost: 0.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2019
  • DocketNotice Small Claims Reassignment; Filed by: Clerk; As to: Pineda Investments, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2019
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for [Notice Small Claims Reassignment]; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2018
  • DocketCase reassigned to Bellflower Courthouse in Department 1 - Hon. Carol Rose; Reason: Inventory Transfer

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 11/26/2018
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 11/26/2018 at 08:30 AM in Downey Courthouse at Department SE2 updated: Result Date to 11/26/2018; Result Type to Not Held - Continued - Party's Motion; Result Type from Not Held - Continued - Party's Motion to Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2018
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 03/20/2019 at 08:30 AM in Downey Courthouse at Department SE2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2018
  • DocketAuthorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims); Filed by: Pineda Investments, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2018
  • DocketCase assigned to in Department SE2 Downey Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2018
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 11/26/2018 at 08:30 AM in Downey Courthouse at Department SE2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2018
  • DocketNotice E-Filing Receipt of Documents; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2018
  • DocketNotice of E-Filing Acceptance (Small Claims); Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2018
  • DocketNotice E-Filing Payment Due; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2018
  • DocketPlaintiff's Claim Cover Sheet (Postponement Before Service); Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2018
  • DocketPlaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court; Filed by: Pineda Investments, Inc. (Plaintiff); As to: Gabriel Vargas Benavidez (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.