This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/09/2021 at 05:12:02 (UTC).

PHUNG TRAN VS LA PARKING VIOLATIONS BUREAU

Case Summary

On 11/25/2020 PHUNG TRAN filed an Infraction - Parking lawsuit against LA PARKING VIOLATIONS BUREAU. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is JAMES E. BLANCARTE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******9891

  • Filing Date:

    11/25/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Infraction - Parking

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Spring Street Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

JAMES E. BLANCARTE

 

Party Details

Appellant

TRAN PHUNG

Respondents

LA PARKING VIOLATIONS BUREAU

CITY OF LOS ANGELES PARKING VIOLATIONS BUREAU

 

Court Documents

Notice of Appeal - Notice of Hearing on Parking Appeal

12/7/2020: Notice of Appeal - Notice of Hearing on Parking Appeal

Request for Administrative File - Request for Administrative File

12/7/2020: Request for Administrative File - Request for Administrative File

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for [Notice of Hearing on Parking Appeal]

12/7/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for [Notice of Hearing on Parking Appeal]

Notice of Appeal - Parking - Notice of Appeal - Parking

11/25/2020: Notice of Appeal - Parking - Notice of Appeal - Parking

Notice of Decision - Final Administrative Decision - Notice of Decision - Final Administrative Decision

11/25/2020: Notice of Decision - Final Administrative Decision - Notice of Decision - Final Administrative Decision

Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court) - Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)

11/25/2020: Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court) - Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

11/25/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/19/2021
  • Hearing02/19/2021 at 09:30 AM in Department 25 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Hearing on Parking Appeal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2020
  • DocketRequest for Administrative File; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2020
  • DocketUpdated -- CITY OF LOS ANGELES PARKING VIOLATIONS BUREAU (Respondent): Organization Name changed from LA Parking Violations Bureau to CITY OF LOS ANGELES PARKING VIOLATIONS BUREAU

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2020
  • DocketHearing on Parking Appeal scheduled for 02/19/2021 at 09:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2020
  • DocketNotice of Hearing on Parking Appeal; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for [Notice of Hearing on Parking Appeal]; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2020
  • DocketNotice of Appeal - Parking - Citation Number: 4515538016; Filed by: Phung Tran (Appellant); As to: LA Parking Violations Bureau (Respondent)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2020
  • DocketRequest to Waive Court Fees; Filed by: Phung Tran (Appellant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2020
  • DocketOrder on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court); Signed and Filed by: Clerk; As to: Phung Tran (Appellant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2020
  • DocketNotice of Decision - Final Administrative Decision; Filed by: Phung Tran (Appellant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. James E. Blancarte in Department 25 Spring Street Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less