This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/27/2018 at 07:18:55 (UTC).

PHEASANT RIDGE INVESTMENT COMPANY, LP VS EMILY WANG, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 06/21/2018 PHEASANT RIDGE INVESTMENT COMPANY, LP filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against EMILY WANG. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, West Covina Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is SUSAN J. TOWNSEND. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1430

  • Filing Date:

    06/21/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

SUSAN J. TOWNSEND

 

Party Details

Appellant and Plaintiff

PHEASANT RIDGE INVESTMENT COMPANY LP

Respondents and Defendants

DAVIS DARRIN

WANG EMILY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SPARKS VALERIE A.

Attorney at Kimball, Tirey & St. John LLP

915 Wilshire Blvd, Ste 1650

Los Angeles, CA 90017

Defendant Attorney

PARTIYELI JACOB OREN

1930 Wilshire Blvd Ste 1936R,

Los Angeles, CA 90057

 

Court Documents

Abandonment of Appeal Submitted APP-005/107 CR-137/145

9/21/2018: Abandonment of Appeal Submitted APP-005/107 CR-137/145

Minute Order - (Hearing on Statement of Appeals)

9/5/2018: Minute Order - (Hearing on Statement of Appeals)

Minute Order - (Hearing on Statement of Appeals)

9/4/2018: Minute Order - (Hearing on Statement of Appeals)

Certificate of Mailing for - Minute Order (Hearing on Statement of Appeals) of 08/28/2018

8/28/2018: Certificate of Mailing for - Minute Order (Hearing on Statement of Appeals) of 08/28/2018

Minute Order - (Hearing on Statement of Appeals)

8/28/2018: Minute Order - (Hearing on Statement of Appeals)

Certificate of Mailing for - Minute Order (Court Order) of 08/21/2018

8/21/2018: Certificate of Mailing for - Minute Order (Court Order) of 08/21/2018

Minute Order - (Court Order)

8/21/2018: Minute Order - (Court Order)

Minute Order - (Court Order)

8/17/2018: Minute Order - (Court Order)

Certificate of Mailing for - Minute Order (Court Order) of 08/17/2018

8/17/2018: Certificate of Mailing for - Minute Order (Court Order) of 08/17/2018

Appeal - Referral of Statement on Appeal for Certification

8/7/2018: Appeal - Referral of Statement on Appeal for Certification

Proposed Statement on Appeal Submitted APP-104 CR-135/143

7/17/2018: Proposed Statement on Appeal Submitted APP-104 CR-135/143

Appeal - Ntc Designating Record of Appeal APP-003/010/103

7/17/2018: Appeal - Ntc Designating Record of Appeal APP-003/010/103

Notice of Appeal

7/17/2018: Notice of Appeal

Appeal - Notice of Appeal/Cross Appeal Filed

7/17/2018: Appeal - Notice of Appeal/Cross Appeal Filed

Appeal - Notice of Filing of Notice of Appeal

7/18/2018: Appeal - Notice of Filing of Notice of Appeal

Certificate of Mailing for - Minute Order (Hearing on Motion - Other to Recapture and Quash Summons) of 07/09/2018

7/9/2018: Certificate of Mailing for - Minute Order (Hearing on Motion - Other to Recapture and Quash Summons) of 07/09/2018

Minute Order - (Hearing on Motion - Other to Recapture and Quash Summons)

7/9/2018: Minute Order - (Hearing on Motion - Other to Recapture and Quash Summons)

Motion to Quash Service of Summons

6/28/2018: Motion to Quash Service of Summons

14 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/21/2018
  • DocketAbandonment of Appeal Submitted APP-005/107 CR-137/145; Filed by:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2018
  • DocketOn the Court's own motion, Hearing on Statement of Appeals scheduled for 09/05/2018 at 08:30 AM in West Covina Courthouse at Department 6 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 09/05/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2018
  • DocketMinute Order (Hearing on Statement of Appeals)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2018
  • DocketMinute Order (Hearing on Statement of Appeals)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2018
  • DocketOn the Court's own motion, Hearing on Statement of Appeals scheduled for 09/04/2018 at 08:30 AM in West Covina Courthouse at Department 6 Held - Continued was rescheduled to 09/05/2018 08:30 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2018
  • DocketHearing on Statement of Appeals scheduled for 09/05/2018 at 08:30 AM in West Covina Courthouse at Department 6

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2018
  • DocketMinute Order (Hearing on Statement of Appeals)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2018
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for Minute Order (Hearing on Statement of Appeals) of 08/28/2018; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2018
  • DocketOn the Court's own motion, Hearing on Statement of Appeals scheduled for 08/28/2018 at 08:30 AM in West Covina Courthouse at Department 6 Not Held - Continued - Court's Motion was rescheduled to 09/04/2018 08:30 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2018
  • DocketHearing on Statement of Appeals scheduled for 09/04/2018 at 08:30 AM in West Covina Courthouse at Department 6

    Read MoreRead Less
19 More Docket Entries
  • 06/28/2018
  • DocketHearing on Motion - Other to Recapture and Quash Summons scheduled for 07/09/2018 at 08:30 AM in West Covina Courthouse at Department 6

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2018
  • DocketMotion to Quash Service of Summons; Filed by: Emily Wang (Defendant); Darrin Davis (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2018
  • DocketNotice of Unlawful Detainer mailed 06/22/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2018
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Pheasant Ridge Investment Company, LP (Plaintiff); As to: Emily Wang (Defendant); Darrin Davis (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2018
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Pheasant Ridge Investment Company, LP (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2018
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2018
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2018
  • DocketProperty Owner/Landlord Only Hearing Notice; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2018
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Susan J. Townsend in Department 6 West Covina Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2018
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 09/05/2018 at 08:30 AM in West Covina Courthouse at Civil Clerk's Office

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where PHEASANT RIDGE INVESTMENT COMPANY LP is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer PARTIYELI JACOB O