This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/20/2017 at 14:42:32 (UTC).

PETER YONAN VS BRAD ROBINSON ENTERPRISES, INC., ET AL.

Case Summary

On 11/10/2016 PETER YONAN filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against BRAD ROBINSON ENTERPRISES, INC . This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Inglewood Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are STEVEN L. BERMAN and RONALD FRANK. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******4787

  • Filing Date:

    11/10/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Inglewood Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judges

STEVEN L. BERMAN

RONALD FRANK

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

YONAN PETER

Defendants

BRAD ROBINSON ENTERPRISES INC.

11677 - 11683 GOSHEN AVENUE LLC

 

Court Documents

Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

11/10/2016: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)

1/10/2017: Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)

Notice (name extension) - E-Filing Payment Due

11/10/2016: Notice (name extension) - E-Filing Payment Due

Notice (name extension) - E-Filing Receipt of Documents

11/10/2016: Notice (name extension) - E-Filing Receipt of Documents

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/13/2017
  • Case reassigned to Hon. Ronald Frank at Inglewood Courthouse in Department 8

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2017
  • Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2017
  • Order for dismissal Without Prejudice entered as to entire action , pursuant to court order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/11/2016
  • Case assigned to Hon. Steven L. Berman at Inglewood Courthouse in Department 8

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/11/2016
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 01/10/2017 at 01:30 PM in Inglewood Courthouse at Department 8

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/11/2016
  • Invoice: Small Claims <= $1,500: Filing for $1,500 or less- CCP 116.230(b)(1); Fee: $30.00; Payment: 30.00 Receipt: 1161110E4891 (Credit Card); Balance: $0.00;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/11/2016
  • Invoice: Web eFiling Transaction Fee - CRC 2.506; Fee: $10.00; Payment: 10.00 Receipt: 1161110E4891 (Credit Card); Balance: $0.00;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2016
  • Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court; Filed by: Peter Yonan (Plaintiff); As to: Brad Robinson Enterprises, Inc. (Defendant); 11677 - 11683 Goshen Avenue, LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2016
  • Notice E-Filing Receipt of Documents; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2016
  • Notice of E-Filing Acceptance (Small Claims); Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2016
  • Notice E-Filing Payment Due; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less