This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/20/2017 at 12:42:46 (UTC).

PETER ROE, ET AL. VS KENNETH BLAKE

Case Summary

On 10/21/2016 PETER ROE filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against KENNETH BLAKE. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Downey Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is MICHAEL J. PEARCE. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******5698

  • Filing Date:

    10/21/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

MICHAEL J. PEARCE

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

ROE PETER

ROE VANESSA

Defendant

BLAKE KENNETH

 

Court Documents

Acknowledgment of Satisfaction of Judgment

5/1/2017: Acknowledgment of Satisfaction of Judgment

Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

10/21/2016: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims)

11/3/2016: Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims)

Unknown

8/10/2017: Unknown

Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)

1/19/2017: Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)

Minute Order - (Ruling on Submitted Matter)

1/23/2017: Minute Order - (Ruling on Submitted Matter)

Minute Order of 01/23/2017 and Judgment Debtor Statement of Assets

1/23/2017: Minute Order of 01/23/2017 and Judgment Debtor Statement of Assets

Other - (name extension) - STATEMENT OF DECISION

1/23/2017: Other - (name extension) - STATEMENT OF DECISION

Receipt for Exhibits

1/24/2017: Receipt for Exhibits

Notice of Small Claims Appeal

2/3/2017: Notice of Small Claims Appeal

Notice of Appeal on Small Claims Judgment

2/3/2017: Notice of Appeal on Small Claims Judgment

Minute Order - (Trial De Novo - Small Claims Appeal)

3/10/2017: Minute Order - (Trial De Novo - Small Claims Appeal)

Minute Order - (Ruling on Submitted Matter)

3/14/2017: Minute Order - (Ruling on Submitted Matter)

Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)

3/14/2017: Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)

Minute Order of 03/14/2017 and Judgment Debtor Statement of Assets

3/14/2017: Minute Order of 03/14/2017 and Judgment Debtor Statement of Assets

Minute Order - (Nunc Pro Tunc Order)

3/14/2017: Minute Order - (Nunc Pro Tunc Order)

Receipt for Exhibits

3/23/2017: Receipt for Exhibits

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/01/2017
  • Acknowledgment of Satisfaction of Judgment; Filed by: Peter Roe (Plaintiff); Vanessa Roe (Plaintiff); As to: Kenneth Blake (Defendant); Type: Full Satisfaction

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2017
  • Updated -- Judgment entered on 05/01/2017 ; Status Date changed from 03/14/2017 to 05/01/2017 ; Status changed from Vacated to Satisfied

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2017
  • Receipt for Exhibits; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2017
  • Minute Order (Ruling on Submitted Matter)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2017
  • Updated -- Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims): Result: Vacated; Result Date: 03/14/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2017
  • Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order of 03/14/2017 and Judgment Debtor Statement of Assets; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2017
  • Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims); Entered by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2017
  • Court orders judgment after trial de novo entered for Plaintiff Peter Roe; Plaintiff Vanessa Roe against Defendant Kenneth Blake on the Plaintiff's Claim filed by Peter Roe, et al. on 10/21/2016 for the principal amount of $2,095.00 and costs of $115.00 for a total of $2,210.00.; Other: EXHIBITS TO CUSTODIAN.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2017
  • Updated -- On the Plaintiff's Claim filed by Peter Roe, et al. on 10/21/2016, judgment entered on 01/23/2017 is vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2017
  • On the Plaintiff's Claim filed by Peter Roe, et al. on 10/21/2016, judgment entered on 01/23/2017 as to Kenneth Blake is vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
11 More Docket Entries
  • 01/23/2017
  • Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order of 01/23/2017 and Judgment Debtor Statement of Assets; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2017
  • Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims); Entered by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2017
  • Court orders judgment entered for Plaintiff Peter Roe; Plaintiff Vanessa Roe against Defendant Kenneth Blake on the Plaintiff's Claim filed by Peter Roe, et al. on 10/21/2016 for the principal amount of $5,517.07 and costs of $115.00 for a total of $5,632.07.; Other: Statement of Decision. EXHIBITS TO CUSTODIAN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2017
  • Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2017
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 01/19/2017 at 08:30 AM in Downey Courthouse at Department SE2 updated: Result Date to 01/19/2017; Result Type to Held - Taken under Submission

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2016
  • Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims); Filed by: Non-Party; As to: Kenneth Blake (Defendant); Service Cost: 40.00; Service Cost Waived: No; Service Date: 11/01/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2016
  • Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court; Filed by: Peter Roe (Plaintiff); Vanessa Roe (Plaintiff); As to: Kenneth Blake (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2016
  • Invoice: Small Claims >$ 5,000 to $10,000- CCP116.230(b)(3);CCP 116.221; Fee: $75.00; Payment: 75.00 Receipt: DW-2016-0006339 (Credit Card); Balance: $0.00;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2016
  • Case assigned to Hon. Michael J. Pearce at Downey Courthouse in Department SE2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2016
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 01/19/2017 at 08:30 AM in Downey Courthouse at Department SE2

    Read MoreRead Less