This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/21/2019 at 01:59:46 (UTC).

PETA STINSON VS THE HUNTLEY HOTEL

Case Summary

On 01/16/2018 PETA STINSON filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against THE HUNTLEY HOTEL. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Santa Monica Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is MATTHEW ST. GEORGE. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0212

  • Filing Date:

    01/16/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

MATTHEW ST. GEORGE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STINSON PETA

Defendants

THE HUNTLEY HOTEL

SASSOWIAN SUHRAB

SECOND STREET CORPORATION

SECOND STREET CORPORATION DBA THE HUNTLEY HOTEL

 

Court Documents

Certificate of Mailing for - [Minute Order (Court Order)]

2/15/2018: Certificate of Mailing for - [Minute Order (Court Order)]

Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims) - Manju Raman - General Manager

4/20/2018: Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims) - Manju Raman - General Manager

Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)

4/20/2018: Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)

Certificate of Mailing for - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial) of 04/20/2018 and Judgment Debtor Statement of Assets, Judgment

4/20/2018: Certificate of Mailing for - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial) of 04/20/2018 and Judgment Debtor Statement of Assets, Judgment

Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)

4/20/2018: Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

3/8/2018: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

3/8/2018: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

3/8/2018: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Order on Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims)

2/14/2018: Order on Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims)

Plaintiff's Claim Cover Sheet (Postponement Before Service)

2/15/2018: Plaintiff's Claim Cover Sheet (Postponement Before Service)

Certificate of Mailing for - Minute Order (Court Order) of 02/14/2018

2/14/2018: Certificate of Mailing for - Minute Order (Court Order) of 02/14/2018

Minute Order - (Court Order)

2/14/2018: Minute Order - (Court Order)

Certificate of Mailing for - Minute Order (Court Order) of 02/15/2018

2/15/2018: Certificate of Mailing for - Minute Order (Court Order) of 02/15/2018

Minute Order - (Court Order)

2/15/2018: Minute Order - (Court Order)

Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims)

2/13/2018: Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims)

Request for Court Order and Answer

2/13/2018: Request for Court Order and Answer

Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court - (Amended)

2/13/2018: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court - (Amended)

10 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/20/2018
  • DocketMinute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2018
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial) of 04/20/2018 and Judgment Debtor Statement of Assets, Judgment; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2018
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims); Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2018
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 04/20/2018 at 08:30 AM in Santa Monica Courthouse at Department E updated: Result Date to 04/20/2018; Result Type to Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2018
  • DocketCourt orders judgment entered for Plaintiff Peta Stinson against Defendant Second Street Corporation DBA The Huntley Hotel, Defendant Suhrab Sassowian and Defendant Second Street Corporation on the Amended Plaintiff's Claim (1st) filed by Peta Stinson on 02/13/2018 for the principal amount of $3,157.37 and costs of $215.00 for a total of $3,372.37.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2018
  • DocketAuthorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims) Manju Raman - General Manager; Filed by: Second Street Corporation (Defendant); Second Street Corporation (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2018
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: Peta Stinson (Plaintiff); As to: Second Street Corporation (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 02/21/2018; Service Cost: 55.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2018
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: Peta Stinson (Plaintiff); As to: Suhrab Sassowian (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 02/21/2018; Service Cost: 55.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2018
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: Peta Stinson (Plaintiff); As to: Second Street Corporation (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 02/21/2018; Service Cost: 55.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2018
  • DocketUpdated -- Certificate of Mailing for [Minute Order (Court Order)]: Result: Returned Undeliverable; Result Date: 02/22/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
10 More Docket Entries
  • 02/13/2018
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 04/20/2018 at 08:30 AM in Santa Monica Courthouse at Department E

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2018
  • DocketRequest to Postpone Trial (Small Claims); Filed by: Peta Stinson (Plaintiff); Has the Claim Been Served?: Yes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2018
  • DocketRequest for Court Order and Answer; Filed by: Peta Stinson (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2018
  • DocketProof of Service - Personal (Small Claims); Filed by: Peta Stinson (Plaintiff); As to: The Huntley Hotel (Defendant); Service Cost: 75.00; Service Cost Waived: No; Service Date: 01/26/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2018
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Matthew St. George in Department E Santa Monica Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2018
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 02/23/2018 at 08:30 AM in Santa Monica Courthouse at Department E

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2018
  • DocketPlaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court; Filed by: Peta Stinson (Plaintiff); As to: The Huntley Hotel (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2018
  • DocketNotice E-Filing Receipt of Documents; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2018
  • DocketNotice of E-Filing Acceptance (Small Claims); Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2018
  • DocketNotice E-Filing Payment Due; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where THE HUNTLEY HOTEL is a litigant

Latest cases where SECOND STREET CORPORATION (DOE 1) is a litigant