This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/12/2019 at 00:42:19 (UTC).

PERSONAL STORAGE 1 VS PAYDA, ROMEN

Case Summary

On 11/19/2015 PERSONAL STORAGE 1 filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against PAYDA, ROMEN. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Van Nuys Courthouse East located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are AMIR SOLEMANIAN and RICHARD F. WALMARK. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****0313

  • Filing Date:

    11/19/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Courthouse:

    Van Nuys Courthouse East

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

AMIR SOLEMANIAN

RICHARD F. WALMARK

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

PERSONAL STORAGE 1

PERSONAL STORAGE 1 ATTY: KURT N. STRAUSS

Defendant

PAYDA ROMEN

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/08/2016
  • DocketSTIPULATION AND ORDER APPOINTING TEMPORARY JUDGE SIGNED AND FILED.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/08/2016
  • DocketCAUSE CALLED AT 08:30A M, IN DEPT. NWZ , HON. AMIR SOLEMANIAN, PRO-TEM PRESIDING FOR HEARING RE: SMALL CLAIMS APPEAL TRIAL DE NOVO. APPELLANT APPEARING . RESPONDENT APPEARING.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/08/2016
  • DocketJUDGMENT ENTERED AS A FINAL DISPOSITION AFTER APPEAL AND TRIAL DE NOVO ON 04/08/16 . FOR (PERSONAL STORAGE 1) ATTY: KURT N. STRAUSS . AGAINST (PAYDA, ROMEN) . PRINCIPAL $ 4779.00 , COSTS $ 135.00 , ATTORNEY FEES $ 0.00 , AND SUPERIOR COURT COSTS $ 0.00 . TOTAL $ 4914.00 .

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/06/2016
  • DocketFAX FILING - SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY RECEIVED AS TO (PERSONAL STORAGE 1) .

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/06/2016
  • DocketSUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY FILED FOR (PERSONAL STORAGE 1) ATTY: KURT N. STRAUSS .

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/16/2016
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING OF APPEAL FILED AND MAILED TO RESPECTIVE PARTIES/COUNSEL. CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE FILED.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/10/2016
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEAL FILED BY (PAYDA, ROMEN) . RECEIPT # LAV619340048 . MATTER SET FOR HEARING RE: SMALL CLAIMS APPEAL TRIAL DE NOVO ON 04/08/16 AT 08:30A M, IN DEPT. NWZ OF THE VAN NUYS SUPERIOR COURT- EAST BUILDING, 3RD FLOOR, ROOM 310 . CLERK'S NOTICE OF FILING OF APPEAL AND CLERK'S NOTICE OF SMALL CLAIMS APPEAL TRIAL DE NOVO FILED AND MAILED TO RESPECTIVE PARTIES/COUNSEL. CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE FILED.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/18/2016
  • DocketNOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT FILED AND MAILED TO ALL PARTIES, AND JUDGMENT DEBTOR'S STATEMENT OF ASSETS MAILED TO (PAYDA, ROMEN) .

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/17/2016
  • DocketCASE FILE RETURNED TO SMALL CLAIMS OFFICE FROM COURTROOM NWP .

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/11/2016
  • DocketAUTHORIZATION TO APPEAR ON BEHALF OF PARTY FILED AS TO (PERSONAL STORAGE 1) . BARRY CARLISI

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/11/2016
  • DocketCAUSE CALLED AT 08:30A M, IN DEPT. NWP , HON. RICHARD F. WALMARK PRESIDING FOR SMALL CLAIMS HEARING. PLAINTIFF APPEARING BY BARRY CARLISI . DEFENDANT APPEARING .

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/11/2016
  • DocketCOURT ORDERS JUDGMENT ENTERED AS FOLLOWS :

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/11/2016
  • DocketJUDGMENT ENTERED AS A FINAL DISPOSITION ON 02/11/16 . FOR (PERSONAL STORAGE 1) . AGAINST (PAYDA, ROMEN) . PRINCIPAL $ 4779.00 . COSTS $ 135.00 . TOTAL $ 4914.00 . EXECUTION STAYED 30 DAYS. CONTESTED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/04/2016
  • DocketAUTHORIZATION TO APPEAR ON BEHALF OF PARTY FILED AS TO (PERSONAL STORAGE 1) . BARRY CARLISI, MANAGER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/04/2016
  • DocketCAUSE CALLED AT 03:00P M, IN DEPT. NWP , HON. RICHARD F. WALMARK PRESIDING FOR SMALL CLAIMS HEARING. MATTER CONTINUED FOR SMALL CLAIMS TRIAL ON 02/11/16 AT 08:30A M, IN DEPT. NWP .

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/04/2016
  • DocketCLERK`S NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF HEARING FILED AND MAILED TO RESPECTIVE PARTIES/COUNSEL. CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FILED.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/25/2016
  • DocketREQUEST FOR CONTINUANCE/POSTPONEMENT OF (PAYDA, ROMEN) IS GRANTED. MATTER CONTINUED FOR SMALL CLAIM HEARING ON 02/04/16 AT 08:30A M. IN DEPT. NWP , CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE FILED AND MAILED TO RESPECTIVE PARTIES.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/28/2015
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE OF PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM FILED. SERVED AS TO (PAYDA, ROMEN) . COSTS OF $ 85.00 .

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/19/2015
  • DocketPLAINTIFF'S CLAIM AND ORDER TO DEFENDANT FILED. RN LAV.... HEARING SET FOR 01/21/16 AT 08:30 AM IN DPT. NWP.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/19/2015
  • DocketFICTITIOUS BUSINESS NAME DECLARATION FILED.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where PERSONAL STORAGE is a litigant