Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/28/2019 at 10:58:13 (UTC).

PERSOLVE LLC VS JONES, ANDREA M

Case Summary

On 08/31/2012 PERSOLVE LLC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against JONES, ANDREA M. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****8731

  • Filing Date:

    08/31/2012

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

PERSOLVE LLC

PERSOLVE LLC DBA ACCOUNT RESOLUTION ASSOCIATES

Defendants

JONES ANDREA M

BEAD BAR INC.

JONES ANDREA M.

BEAD BAR INC

JONES ANDREA M AKA OSBORNE ANDREA M

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

PATTI-JELSVIK, ALAINE

PATTI-JELSVIK ALAINE

Defendant Attorneys

GALEY MICHAEL L.

OSBORNE CARL K.

OSBORNE, CARL K.

GALEY, MICHAEL L.

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/14/2014
  • DocketDISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE-ENTIRE ACTION, FILED & ENTERED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2014
  • DocketSTIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL; ORDER. STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL; ORDER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2014
  • DocketA/C CALENDAR-HEARING DATE DELETED REASON: COURT ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2014
  • DocketJURY TRIAL SET FOR 11/17/14, 08:30 AM, DEPT 77

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2013
  • DocketGENERAL ORDER FILED GENERAL ORDER FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2013
  • DocketCASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2013
  • DocketJURY TRIAL SET FOR 05/20/14 AT 08:30 AM IN DEPT 77

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2013
  • DocketSTATUS CONFERENCE HELD, MINUTE ORDER FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2013
  • DocketJURY TRIAL SET FOR 05/20/14 AT 08:30 AM IN DEPT 77

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2013
  • DocketSTATUS CONFERENCE HELD, MINUTE ORDER FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
17 More Docket Entries
  • 12/11/2012
  • DocketCASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2012
  • DocketRESPONSE FILED - ANSWER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2012
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE TO COMPLAINT FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2012
  • DocketSERV:9/7/12;PERS SERV/IND DEF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2012
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE TO COMPLAINT FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2012
  • DocketSUB SERV:9/7/12;CCP 416.10

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2012
  • DocketCMR CLERK'S CERT OF SERVICE MAILED TO RESPECTIVE PARTIES/COUNSEL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2012
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FILED Filing Fee: 370.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2012
  • DocketSUMMONS FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2012
  • DocketNON-APP CASE MGMT REVIEW SCHEDULED FOR 01/02/13, IN DEPT 106

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where PERSOLVE LLC A LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY DBA ACCOUNT RESOLUTION AS is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer OSBORNE CARL K.