This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/01/2021 at 11:26:36 (UTC).

PERSOLVE LEGAL GROUP, LLP VS ALTYNAY UMAROVA

Case Summary

On 12/31/2020 PERSOLVE LEGAL GROUP, LLP filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against ALTYNAY UMAROVA. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Chatsworth Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is KAREN MOSKOWITZ. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3459

  • Filing Date:

    12/31/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

KAREN MOSKOWITZ

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PERSOLVE LEGAL GROUP LLP

Defendant

UMAROVA ALTYNAY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

REYNOLDS SARAH JANE

 

Court Documents

Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740) - Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740)

12/31/2020: Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740) - Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740)

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

12/31/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

Summons - Summons on Complaint

12/31/2020: Summons - Summons on Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet Addendum

12/31/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet Addendum

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

12/31/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint - Complaint

12/31/2020: Complaint - Complaint

Declaration re: Due Diligence - Declaration re: Due Diligence

4/9/2021: Declaration re: Due Diligence - Declaration re: Due Diligence

Declaration re: Due Diligence - Declaration re: Due Diligence

4/9/2021: Declaration re: Due Diligence - Declaration re: Due Diligence

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/06/2022
  • Hearing01/06/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department F43 at 9425 Penfield Ave., Chatsworth, CA 91311; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service and Failure to File Default Judgment Pursuant to CRC 3.740

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • DocketDeclaration re: Due Diligence; Filed by: Persolve Legal Group, LLP (Plaintiff); As to: Altynay Umarova (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • DocketDeclaration re: Due Diligence; Filed by: Persolve Legal Group, LLP (Plaintiff); As to: Altynay Umarova (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Persolve Legal Group, LLP (Plaintiff); As to: Altynay Umarova (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2020
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Persolve Legal Group, LLP (Plaintiff); As to: Altynay Umarova (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet Addendum; Filed by: Persolve Legal Group, LLP (Plaintiff); As to: Altynay Umarova (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Persolve Legal Group, LLP (Plaintiff); As to: Altynay Umarova (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2020
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740); Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2020
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service and Failure to File Default Judgment Pursuant to CRC 3.740 scheduled for 01/06/2022 at 08:30 AM in Chatsworth Courthouse at Department F43

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2020
  • DocketThe case is placed in special status of: Collections Case (CCP 3.740)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Karen Moskowitz in Department F43 Chatsworth Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Persolve Legal Group, LLP is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer REYNOLDS SARAH JANE