This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 11/28/2020 at 04:42:23 (UTC).

PEREZ RECONSTRUCTION CONTRACTORS, INC., VS ROXBURY PROPERTIES, LLC

Case Summary

On 07/21/2020 PEREZ RECONSTRUCTION CONTRACTORS, INC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against ROXBURY PROPERTIES, LLC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is JAMES E. BLANCARTE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******6050

  • Filing Date:

    07/21/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

JAMES E. BLANCARTE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PEREZ RECONSTRUCTION CONTRACTORS INC. DBA PRC

Defendant

ROXBURY PROPERTIES LLC AKA ROXBURY PROPERTY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SCHILLER MICHAEL I.

 

Court Documents

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

7/21/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

Complaint - Complaint

7/21/2020: Complaint - Complaint

First Amended Standing Order - First Amended Standing Order

7/21/2020: First Amended Standing Order - First Amended Standing Order

Summons - Summons on Complaint

7/21/2020: Summons - Summons on Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

7/27/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/25/2023
  • Hearing07/25/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 25 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • Hearing01/18/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 25 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: PEREZ RECONSTRUCTION CONTRACTORS, INC., (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: PEREZ RECONSTRUCTION CONTRACTORS, INC., (Plaintiff); As to: Roxbury Properties, LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2020
  • DocketFirst Amended Standing Order; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2020
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 01/18/2022 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2020
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 07/25/2023 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2020
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: PEREZ RECONSTRUCTION CONTRACTORS, INC., (Plaintiff); As to: Roxbury Properties, LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. James E. Blancarte in Department 25 Spring Street Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ROXBURY PROPERTIES INC is a litigant

Latest cases where PEREZ RECONSTRUCTION CONTRACTORS INC. DBA PRC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer SCHILLER MICHAEL I. ATTORNEY AT LAW