This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 12/06/2020 at 06:16:07 (UTC).

PEREZ RECONSTRUCTION CONTRACTORS, INC. VS COLIN CUNNINGHAM, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 11/04/2020 PEREZ RECONSTRUCTION CONTRACTORS, INC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against COLIN CUNNINGHAM. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is JAMES E. BLANCARTE. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******9327

  • Filing Date:

    11/04/2020

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

JAMES E. BLANCARTE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PEREZ RECONSTRUCTION CONTRACTORS INC. DBA PRC

Defendants

CUNNINGHAM COLIN

CUNNINGHAM ELIZABETH

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SCHILLER MICHAEL I.

 

Court Documents

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

11/4/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

First Amended Standing Order - First Amended Standing Order

11/4/2020: First Amended Standing Order - First Amended Standing Order

Summons - Summons on Complaint

11/4/2020: Summons - Summons on Complaint

Complaint - Complaint

11/4/2020: Complaint - Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

11/4/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

11/20/2020: Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/30/2020
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 05/04/2022 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 11/30/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2020
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 11/08/2023 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 11/30/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2020
  • DocketAddress for Michael I. Schiller (Attorney) null

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2020
  • DocketOn the Complaint filed by Perez Reconstruction Contractors, Inc. on 11/04/2020, entered Request for Dismissal without prejudice filed by Perez Reconstruction Contractors, Inc. as to the entire action

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2020
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 05/04/2022 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2020
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 11/08/2023 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. James E. Blancarte in Department 25 Spring Street Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Perez Reconstruction Contractors, Inc. (Plaintiff); As to: Colin Cunningham (Defendant); Elizabeth Cunningham (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Perez Reconstruction Contractors, Inc. (Plaintiff); As to: Colin Cunningham (Defendant); Elizabeth Cunningham (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2020
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Perez Reconstruction Contractors, Inc. (Plaintiff); As to: Colin Cunningham (Defendant); Elizabeth Cunningham (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2020
  • DocketFirst Amended Standing Order; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where PEREZ RECONSTRUCTION CONTRACTORS INC. DBA PRC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer SCHILLER MICHAEL I. ATTORNEY AT LAW