This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/11/2021 at 10:33:54 (UTC).

PEREZ, JOSE VS PRYSOCK, BILLY E

Case Summary

On 05/18/2015 PEREZ, JOSE filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against PRYSOCK, BILLY E. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****6035

  • Filing Date:

    05/18/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

PEREZ JOSE

SANCHEZ KARLA

Defendants

PRYSOCK BILLY E

JESPERSEN ROGER LEON

JESPERSEN LOREN ROY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LAW OFFICES OF MORSE MEHRBAN A P C

15233 Ventura Blvd Ste 304

Sherman Oaks, CA 91403-0000

 

Court Documents

Memorandum of Costs After Judgment, Acknowledgment of Credit, and Declaration of Accrued Interest - Memorandum of Costs After Judgment, Acknowledgment of Credit, and Declaration of Accrued Interest

9/24/2019: Memorandum of Costs After Judgment, Acknowledgment of Credit, and Declaration of Accrued Interest - Memorandum of Costs After Judgment, Acknowledgment of Credit, and Declaration of Accrued Interest

Motion to Set Aside/Vacate Default and / or Default Judgment - Motion to Set Aside/Vacate Default and / or Default Judgment

5/18/2020: Motion to Set Aside/Vacate Default and / or Default Judgment - Motion to Set Aside/Vacate Default and / or Default Judgment

Declaration (name extension) - Declaration of June Davidson with Exhibits

5/18/2020: Declaration (name extension) - Declaration of June Davidson with Exhibits

Minute Order - Minute Order (Court Order Re: Hearing on Motion to Set Aside/Vacate Default...)

5/22/2020: Minute Order - Minute Order (Court Order Re: Hearing on Motion to Set Aside/Vacate Default...)

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order Re: Hearing on Motion to Set Aside/Vacate Default...) of 05/22/2020

5/22/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order Re: Hearing on Motion to Set Aside/Vacate Default...) of 05/22/2020

Minute Order - (Court Order)

9/26/2017: Minute Order - (Court Order)

Notice of Entry of Judgment / Dismissal / Other Order

9/27/2017: Notice of Entry of Judgment / Dismissal / Other Order

Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)

10/30/2017: Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)

Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)

5/2/2018: Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/01/2020
  • DocketMemorandum of Costs After Judgment, Acknowledgment of Credit, and Declaration of Accrued Interest; Filed by: JOSE PEREZ (Plaintiff); KARLA SANCHEZ (Plaintiff); As to: BILLY E PRYSOCK (Defendant); Costs: 1694.00; Interest: 3549.29; Service Date: 08/31/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2020
  • DocketMinute Order (Hearing on Motion to Set Aside/Vacate Default and Default Jud...)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2020
  • DocketHearing on Motion to Set Aside/Vacate Default and Default Judgment (CCP 473.5) scheduled for 08/31/2020 at 10:00 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25 updated: Result Date to 08/31/2020; Result Type to Held - Motion Denied

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2020
  • DocketProof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by: BILLY E PRYSOCK (Defendant); As to: JOSE PEREZ (Plaintiff); KARLA SANCHEZ (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2020
  • DocketHearing on Motion to Set Aside/Vacate Default and Default Judgment (CCP 473.5) scheduled for 08/31/2020 at 10:00 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2020
  • DocketMinute Order (Court Order Re: Hearing on Motion to Set Aside/Vacate Default...)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for (Court Order Re: Hearing on Motion to Set Aside/Vacate Default...) of 05/22/2020; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2020
  • DocketMotion to Set Aside/Vacate Default and / or Default Judgment; Filed by: BILLY E PRYSOCK (Defendant); As to: JOSE PEREZ (Plaintiff); KARLA SANCHEZ (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2020
  • DocketDeclaration of June Davidson with Exhibits; Filed by: BILLY E PRYSOCK (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2020
  • DocketCase reassigned to Spring Street Courthouse in Department 25 - Hon. James E. Blancarte; Reason: Other

    Read MoreRead Less
61 More Docket Entries
  • 07/23/2015
  • DocketSUBMISSION FOR DEFAULT ONLY PENDING *** DEFAULT PROCESSE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2015
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE TO COMPLAINT FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2015
  • DocketDISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE - FILED & ENTERED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2015
  • DocketNON-JURY TRIAL SET FOR 11/18/16, 08:30 AM, DEPT 77 * * DELETED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2015
  • DocketOSC SET 05/18/18, 08:30 AM, DEPT. 77 PURSUANT TO GENERAL ORDER * * DELETED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2015
  • DocketA/C - COMPLAINT FILED REASON: OTHERS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2015
  • DocketFEE WAIVER FILED -CASE FILING FEE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2015
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FILED - CIVIL RIGHTS/DISCRIMINIATION FILED Filing Fee: 225.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2015
  • DocketSUMMONS FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2015
  • DocketFEE WAIVER FILED -CASE FILING FEE.

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: 15K06035    Hearing Date: August 31, 2020    Dept: 25

MOTION TO SET ASIDE DEFAULT JUDGMENT OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE WRONGFUL LIEN RECORDING

(CCP §§ 473, 473.5)

TENTATIVE RULING:

Nonparty June Davidson’s Motion to Set Aside Judgment or, in the Alternative, Set Aside Wrongful Recording is DENIED.

SERVICE

[X] Proof of Service Timely Filed (CRC, rule 3.1300) OK

[X] Correct Address (CCP §§ 1013, 1013a) OK

[X] 16/21 Court Days Lapsed (CCP §§ 12c, 1005(b)) OK

OPPOSITION: None filed as of August 26, 2020 [   ] Late [X] None

REPLY: None filed as of August 26, 2020 [   ] Late [X] None

ANALYSIS:

I. Background

On May 18, 2015, Plaintiffs Jose Perez and Karla Sanchez (collectively, “Plaintiffs”) filed an action for violation of the Unruh Civil Rights Act against Defendant Billy Prysock (“Prysock”), Roger Leon Jespersen (“Roger”), and Loren Roy Jespersen (“Loren”). Defendants Loren and Roger were dismissed from the action on June 11, 2015 and September 14, 2015, respectively. Plaintiff filed a proof of service demonstrating that Defendant Prysock was served with the Summons and Complaint on May 29, 2015 by certified mail at 215 Clark Mountain Road, Huntsville, AL 35810 with return receipt requested in accordance with Code of Civil Procedure section 415.40. (7/20/15 Proof of Service.)

Following Defendant Prysock’s failure to answer the Complaint, default was entered against him on July 23, 2015. A default judgment was entered on October 10, 2017 in the amount of $12,267.90, based on statutory damages of $8,000.00, attorney’s fees of $3,700.00, and costs of $567.90 (the “Judgment”). (10/10/17 Judgment.)

On May 18, 2020, Nonparty June Davidson (“Davidson”) filed the instant Motion to Set Aside Judgment or, in the Alternative, Set Aside Wrongful Recording (the “Motion”). To date, no opposition has been filed.

 

II. Legal Standard & Discussion

 

Relying on Code of Civil Procedure section 473.5, section 663, and the Court’s equitable powers, Nonparty Davidson seeks to set aside the default judgment entered against Defendant Prysock on the basis that he was never served with the Summons and Complaint. (Mot., pp. 5:18-23; 6:11-7:14.)

“When service of summons has not resulted in actual notice to a party in time to defend the action and a default or default judgment has been entered against him or her in the action, he or she may serve and file a notice of motion to set aside the default and for leave to defend the action.” (Code Civ. Proc., § 473.5, subd. (a).) (Italics added.) “Apart from any statute, courts have the inherent authority to vacate a default and default judgment on equitable grounds such as extrinsic fraud or extrinsic mistake. [Citations.]” (Bae v.  T.D. Service Co. of Arizona (2016) 245 Cal.App.4th 89, 97.) “Extrinsic fraud occurs where one party was deprived of an opportunity to present his claim or defense in court, where he was kept ignorant or, other than from his own negligence, fraudulently prevented from fully participating in the proceeding.” (Sporn v. Home Depot USA, Inc. (2005) 126 Cal.App.4th 1294, 1300.) To set aside a default or default judgment based on extrinsic fraud or mistake, the moving party must satisfy a three-part test. (Rappleyea v. Campbell (1994) 8 Cal.4th 975, 982.) “First, the defaulted party must demonstrate that it has a meritorious case. Second, the party seeking to set aside the default must articulate a satisfactory excuse for not presenting a defense to the original action. Last [], the moving party must demonstrate diligence in seeking to set aside the default once…discovered. [Citation.]” (Id.) (Italics added.) Further, an aggrieved party may file a motion to set aside a judgment that was based on an “incorrect or erroneous legal basis for the decision, not consistent with or not supported by the facts.” (Code Civ. Proc., § 663, subd. (a).) (Italics added.)

Here, Nonparty Davidson provides evidence that Defendant Prysock passed away on June 22, 2016. (Mot., Davidson Decl., ¶ 11, Exh. B.) She argues that Defendant Prysock did not have notice of this action and that service of process was defective because he was living in California at the time he was purportedly served. (Id. at pp. 6:1-19; 7:9-14.) However, Nonparty Davidson has not demonstrated she has standing to seek relief from default on behalf of decedent Defendant Prysock.

In the alternative, Nonparty Davidson asks that the Court remove the lien recorded by Plaintiff’s attorney against real property located at 1253-1257 Del Rey Ave., Pasadena, CA (the “Property”). (Id. at pp. 7:18-8:8.) She states that she is the current trustee of Continental Investment Company, the true owner of the Property, and that Defendant Prysock never had an ownership interest in the Property. (Id., Davidson Decl., ¶¶ 2, 4, 13.) However, neither Code of Civil Procedure section 473.5, section 663, nor the Court’s equitable powers provide the authority to remove the lien against the Property as requested by Nonparty Davidson.

III. Conclusion & Order

 

For the foregoing reasons, Nonparty June Davidson’s Motion to Set Aside Judgment or, in the Alternative, Set Aside Wrongful Recording is DENIED. 

Moving party is ordered to give notice.