This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/18/2021 at 06:05:36 (UTC).

PEOPLES UNION LLC VS T-MOBILE WEST LLC

Case Summary

On 09/25/2019 PEOPLES UNION LLC filed a Property - Commercial Eviction lawsuit against T-MOBILE WEST LLC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is GAIL KILLEFER. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******9370

  • Filing Date:

    09/25/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Property - Commercial Eviction

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

GAIL KILLEFER

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Appellants

PEOPLES UNION LLC

FIRST REPUBLIC BANK

L.A. DEPOSITIONS INC.

Defendants and Respondents

T-MOBILE WEST LLC

NOSSAMAN LLP

Not Classified By Court

HERNANDEZ ERMELINDA

L.A. DEPOSITIONS INC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

SHAKER DAVID

BASTIAN ROBERT LAWRENCE JR.

Defendant Attorney

MENDENHALL KIRSTIN L

 

Court Documents

Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

8/27/2021: Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

Appeal - Notice of Fees Due for Clerk's Transcript on Appeal - Appeal - Notice of Fees Due for Clerk's Transcript on Appeal BV034418

11/10/2020: Appeal - Notice of Fees Due for Clerk's Transcript on Appeal - Appeal - Notice of Fees Due for Clerk's Transcript on Appeal BV034418

Appeal - Notice Court Reporter to Prepare Appeal Transcript - Appeal - Notice Court Reporter to Prepare Appeal Transcript ;BV033391, NOA 8/13/20;

11/5/2020: Appeal - Notice Court Reporter to Prepare Appeal Transcript - Appeal - Notice Court Reporter to Prepare Appeal Transcript ;BV033391, NOA 8/13/20;

Appeal - Notice to Appellant of Estimated Transcript Costs - Appeal - Notice to Appellant of Estimated Transcript Costs RESPONDENT; BV033391, NOA 8/13/20;

10/8/2020: Appeal - Notice to Appellant of Estimated Transcript Costs - Appeal - Notice to Appellant of Estimated Transcript Costs RESPONDENT; BV033391, NOA 8/13/20;

Appeal Document - Appeal Document NOA: 08/13/20-U BV033391 ORDER TO CONSOLIDATE

9/2/2020: Appeal Document - Appeal Document NOA: 08/13/20-U BV033391 ORDER TO CONSOLIDATE

Appeal Document - Appeal Document 08/13/20-U BV033391 NUNC PRO TUNC

9/9/2020: Appeal Document - Appeal Document 08/13/20-U BV033391 NUNC PRO TUNC

Appeal - Notice Court Reporter to Submit Estimated Cost - Appeal - Notice Court Reporter to Submit Estimated Cost ;BV033391, NOA 8/13/20;

9/15/2020: Appeal - Notice Court Reporter to Submit Estimated Cost - Appeal - Notice Court Reporter to Submit Estimated Cost ;BV033391, NOA 8/13/20;

Appeal - Ntc Designating Record of Appeal APP-003/010/103 - Appeal - Ntc Designating Record of Appeal APP-003/010/103 RESPONDENT "U"

8/28/2020: Appeal - Ntc Designating Record of Appeal APP-003/010/103 - Appeal - Ntc Designating Record of Appeal APP-003/010/103 RESPONDENT "U"

Notice of Limited Scope Representation - Notice of Limited Scope Representation

8/24/2020: Notice of Limited Scope Representation - Notice of Limited Scope Representation

Appeal - Ntc Designating Record of Appeal APP-003/010/103 - Appeal - Ntc Designating Record of Appeal APP-003/010/103 "U"

8/24/2020: Appeal - Ntc Designating Record of Appeal APP-003/010/103 - Appeal - Ntc Designating Record of Appeal APP-003/010/103 "U"

Appeal - Notice of Filing of Notice of Appeal - Appeal - Notice of Filing of Notice of Appeal NOA:8/13/20; "U"

8/21/2020: Appeal - Notice of Filing of Notice of Appeal - Appeal - Notice of Filing of Notice of Appeal NOA:8/13/20; "U"

Appeal - Notice of Appeal/Cross Appeal Filed - Appeal - Notice of Appeal/Cross Appeal Filed "U"

8/13/2020: Appeal - Notice of Appeal/Cross Appeal Filed - Appeal - Notice of Appeal/Cross Appeal Filed "U"

Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing on Motion for Attorney Fees)

7/23/2020: Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing on Motion for Attorney Fees)

Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore - Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore

7/23/2020: Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore - Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (RULING ON MATTER SUBMITTED ON JULY 23, 2020) of 07/24/2020

7/24/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (RULING ON MATTER SUBMITTED ON JULY 23, 2020) of 07/24/2020

Order (name extension) - Ruling on Matter Submitted on July 23, 2020

7/24/2020: Order (name extension) - Ruling on Matter Submitted on July 23, 2020

Minute Order - Minute Order (RULING ON MATTER SUBMITTED ON JULY 23, 2020)

7/24/2020: Minute Order - Minute Order (RULING ON MATTER SUBMITTED ON JULY 23, 2020)

Reply (name extension) - Reply Plaintiff's 2nd Sur-Reply Brief

7/16/2020: Reply (name extension) - Reply Plaintiff's 2nd Sur-Reply Brief

70 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/27/2021
  • DocketOn the Complaint filed by Peoples Union LLC on 09/25/2019, entered Request for Dismissal with prejudice filed by Peoples Union LLC as to the entire action

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2020
  • DocketRequest for Refund of Reporter Appeal Transcript Deposit; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2020
  • DocketAffidavit for Rlse Funds/Req for Payment Rptr Appeal Trnscpt; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2020
  • DocketAppeal Record Delivered; Issued by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2020
  • DocketAppeal - Original Clerk's Transcript 1 - 5 Volumes Certified 1VOL 251 PAGES; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2020
  • DocketAppeal - Clerk's Transcript Fee Paid APPELLANT PAID $343.25; Filed by:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2020
  • DocketAppeal - Notice of Fees Due for Clerk's Transcript on Appeal BV034418; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2020
  • DocketAppeal - Notice Court Reporter to Prepare Appeal Transcript;BV033391, NOA 8/13/20;; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2020
  • DocketAppeal - Reporter Appeal Transcript Process Fee Paid; Filed by: T-Mobile West LLC (Respondent)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2020
  • DocketAppeal - Notice to Appellant of Estimated Transcript Costs RESPONDENT; BV033391, NOA 8/13/20;; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
99 More Docket Entries
  • 10/07/2019
  • DocketHearing on Demurrer - without Motion to Strike scheduled for 11/08/2019 at 01:30 PM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 97

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2019
  • DocketDemurrer - without Motion to Strike; Filed by: T-Mobile West LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2019
  • DocketNotice of Unlawful Detainer mailed 09/27/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2019
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 12/04/2019 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Civil Clerk's Office

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2019
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Gail Killefer in Department 97 Stanley Mosk Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2019
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Peoples Union LLC (Plaintiff); As to: T-Mobile West LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2019
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Peoples Union LLC (Plaintiff); As to: T-Mobile West LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2019
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Peoples Union LLC (Plaintiff); As to: T-Mobile West LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2019
  • DocketProperty Owner/Landlord Only Hearing Notice; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where T-MOBILE WEST LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where NOSSAMAN LLP is a litigant

Latest cases where FIRST REPUBLIC BANK, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where Peoples Union LLC, is a litigant