Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 04/12/2018 at 11:48:03 (UTC).

PEDRO SANTOS AGUILAR VS HUGO A. AGUILAR

Case Summary

On 12/20/2017 PEDRO SANTOS AGUILAR filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against HUGO A AGUILAR. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is JON R. TAKASUGI. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2453

  • Filing Date:

    12/20/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

JON R. TAKASUGI

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

AGUILAR PEDRO SANTOS

Los Angeles, CA 90011

Defendant

AGUILAR HUGO A. DBA HUGO A AGUILAR

Los Angeles, CA 90057

 

Court Documents

(Non-Jury Trial)

2/16/2018: (Non-Jury Trial)

Unknown

12/20/2017: Unknown

Unknown

1/3/2018: Unknown

Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial) of 02/16/2018

2/16/2018: Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial) of 02/16/2018

Unknown

12/20/2017: Unknown

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/16/2018
  • Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2018
  • Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial) of 02/16/2018; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2018
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 02/16/2018 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 90 updated: Result Date to 02/16/2018; Result Type to Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2018
  • Order for dismissal Without Prejudice entered as to entire action

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2018
  • Proof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: Non-Party; As to: Hugo A. Aguilar (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 12/28/17; Service Cost: 40.00; Service Cost Waived: Yes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2017
  • Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court; Filed by: Pedro Santos Aguilar (Plaintiff); As to: Hugo A. Aguilar (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2017
  • Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court); Signed and Filed by: Clerk; As to: Pedro Santos Aguilar (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2017
  • Case assigned to Hon. Jon R. Takasugi in Department 90 Stanley Mosk Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2017
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 02/16/2018 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 90

    Read MoreRead Less