This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/23/2019 at 04:09:14 (UTC).

PCM SALES, INC, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION VS RAMEY-ESTEP HOMES, INC., A KENTUCKY CORPORATION

Case Summary

On 04/25/2019 PCM SALES, INC, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against RAMEY-ESTEP HOMES, INC , A KENTUCKY CORPORATION. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Norwalk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is ANN H. PARK. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******5200

  • Filing Date:

    04/25/2019

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Courthouse:

    Norwalk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

ANN H. PARK

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PCM SALES INC A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

Defendant

RAMEY-ESTEP HOMES INC. A KENTUCKY CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GALEN JEFFREY MICHAEL

 

Court Documents

Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

8/16/2019: Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

6/6/2019: Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

4/25/2019: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

4/25/2019: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740) - Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740)

4/25/2019: Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740) - Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740)

Summons - Summons on Complaint

4/25/2019: Summons - Summons on Complaint

Complaint - Complaint

4/25/2019: Complaint - Complaint

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/16/2019
  • DocketOn the Complaint filed by PCM Sales, Inc, a California Corporation on 04/25/2019, entered Request for Dismissal with prejudice filed by PCM Sales, Inc, a California Corporation as to the entire action

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2019
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by: PCM Sales, Inc, a California Corporation (Plaintiff); As to: Ramey-Estep Homes, Inc., a Kentucky Corporation (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2019
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service and Failure to File Default Judgment Pursuant to CRC 3.740 scheduled for 04/30/2020 at 08:30 AM in Norwalk Courthouse at Department A Not Held - Vacated by Court on 08/16/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2019
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: PCM Sales, Inc, a California Corporation (Plaintiff); As to: Ramey-Estep Homes, Inc., a Kentucky Corporation (Defendant); Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2019
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service and Failure to File Default Judgment Pursuant to CRC 3.740 scheduled for 04/30/2020 at 08:30 AM in Norwalk Courthouse at Department A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2019
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Ann H. Park in Department A Norwalk Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2019
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: PCM Sales, Inc, a California Corporation (Plaintiff); As to: Ramey-Estep Homes, Inc., a Kentucky Corporation (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2019
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: PCM Sales, Inc, a California Corporation (Plaintiff); As to: Ramey-Estep Homes, Inc., a Kentucky Corporation (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2019
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: PCM Sales, Inc, a California Corporation (Plaintiff); As to: Ramey-Estep Homes, Inc., a Kentucky Corporation (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2019
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740); Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2019
  • DocketThe case is placed in special status of: Collections Case (CCP 3.740)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where PCM SALES INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer GALEN JEFFREY M.