This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/16/2020 at 07:47:44 (UTC).

PCM SALES INC, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION VS LIAM MOORE ASSOCIATES LLC, A MICHIGAN LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

Case Summary

On 03/12/2019 PCM SALES INC, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against LIAM MOORE ASSOCIATES LLC, A MICHIGAN LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Norwalk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is ANN H. PARK. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******9993

  • Filing Date:

    03/12/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Courthouse:

    Norwalk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

ANN H. PARK

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PCM SALES INC A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

Defendant

LIAM MOORE ASSOCIATES LLC A MICHIGAN LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GALEN JEFFREY MICHAEL

 

Court Documents

Declaration Pursuant to 585 CCP in Support of Default Judgment - Declaration Pursuant to 585 CCP in Support of Default Judgment

12/5/2019: Declaration Pursuant to 585 CCP in Support of Default Judgment - Declaration Pursuant to 585 CCP in Support of Default Judgment

Declaration re: Attorney's Fees - Declaration re: Attorney's Fees

12/5/2019: Declaration re: Attorney's Fees - Declaration re: Attorney's Fees

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment - Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

12/5/2019: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment - Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Declaration (name extension) - Declaration Re: 1033

12/5/2019: Declaration (name extension) - Declaration Re: 1033

Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

12/5/2019: Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

Default Judgment - Default Judgment

12/10/2019: Default Judgment - Default Judgment

Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

6/3/2019: Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for [Proof of Personal Service]

6/7/2019: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for [Proof of Personal Service]

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

3/12/2019: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - Summons on Complaint

3/12/2019: Summons - Summons on Complaint

Complaint - Complaint

3/12/2019: Complaint - Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

3/12/2019: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740) - Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740)

3/12/2019: Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740) - Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740)

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/11/2019
  • DocketDefault judgment by Court entered for Plaintiff PCM Sales Inc, a California Corporation against Defendant Liam Moore Associates LLC, a Michigan Limited Liability Company on the Complaint filed by PCM Sales Inc, a California Corporation on 03/12/2019 for the principal amount of $14,280.58, attorney fees of $818.42, interest of $5,270.68, and costs of $495.00 for a total of $20,864.68.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2019
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service and Failure to File Default Judgment Pursuant to CRC 3.740 scheduled for 03/17/2020 at 08:30 AM in Norwalk Courthouse at Department A Not Held - Vacated by Court on 12/11/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2019
  • DocketDefault Judgment; Filed by: PCM Sales Inc, a California Corporation (Plaintiff); As to: Liam Moore Associates LLC, a Michigan Limited Liability Company (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketOn the Complaint filed by PCM Sales Inc, a California Corporation on 03/12/2019, entered Request for Dismissal without prejudice filed by PCM Sales Inc, a California Corporation, does 1-50 ONLY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default / Judgment; Filed by: PCM Sales Inc, a California Corporation (Plaintiff); As to: Liam Moore Associates LLC, a Michigan Limited Liability Company (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • DocketDeclaration re: Attorney's Fees; Filed by: PCM Sales Inc, a California Corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • DocketDeclaration Pursuant to 585 CCP in Support of Default Judgment; Filed by: PCM Sales Inc, a California Corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • DocketDeclaration Re: 1033; Filed by: PCM Sales Inc, a California Corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • DocketDefault entered as to Liam Moore Associates LLC, a Michigan Limited Liability Company; On the Complaint filed by PCM Sales Inc, a California Corporation on 03/12/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by: PCM Sales Inc, a California Corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2019
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for [Proof of Personal Service]; Issued by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2019
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: PCM Sales Inc, a California Corporation (Plaintiff); As to: Liam Moore Associates LLC, a Michigan Limited Liability Company (Defendant); Service Date: 05/10/2019; Service Cost: 69.17; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2019
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740); Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2019
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: PCM Sales Inc, a California Corporation (Plaintiff); As to: Liam Moore Associates LLC, a Michigan Limited Liability Company (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2019
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: PCM Sales Inc, a California Corporation (Plaintiff); As to: Liam Moore Associates LLC, a Michigan Limited Liability Company (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2019
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: PCM Sales Inc, a California Corporation (Plaintiff); As to: Liam Moore Associates LLC, a Michigan Limited Liability Company (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2019
  • DocketThe case is placed in special status of: Collections Case (CCP 3.740)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2019
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service and Failure to File Default Judgment Pursuant to CRC 3.740 scheduled for 03/17/2020 at 08:30 AM in Norwalk Courthouse at Department A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2019
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Ann H. Park in Department A Norwalk Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where PCM SALES INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer GALEN JEFFREY M.