This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/05/2020 at 19:49:14 (UTC).

PC RUTHERFORD REALTY CORP. VS TREVOR JEVON ERVIN

Case Summary

On 02/18/2020 PC RUTHERFORD REALTY CORP filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against TREVOR JEVON ERVIN. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is GAIL KILLEFER. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1754

  • Filing Date:

    02/18/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

GAIL KILLEFER

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PC RUTHERFORD REALTY CORP.

Defendant

ERVIN TREVOR JEVON

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

FEINBERG LAURENCE

 

Court Documents

Application for Writ of Possession - Application for Writ of Possession

3/24/2020: Application for Writ of Possession - Application for Writ of Possession

Writ of (name extension) - Writ of Possession

3/24/2020: Writ of (name extension) - Writ of Possession

Judgment - Unlawful Detainer - Judgment - Unlawful Detainer

3/23/2020: Judgment - Unlawful Detainer - Judgment - Unlawful Detainer

Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

3/17/2020: Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

3/17/2020: Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Posting

3/17/2020: Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Posting

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment - Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

3/17/2020: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment - Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) - Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) (TREVOR JEVON ERVIN)

2/21/2020: Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) - Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) (TREVOR JEVON ERVIN)

Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) - Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) (ALL OCCUPANTS)

2/21/2020: Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) - Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) (ALL OCCUPANTS)

Complaint - Complaint

2/18/2020: Complaint - Complaint

Summons - Summons on Complaint

2/18/2020: Summons - Summons on Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

2/18/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

2/18/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

Property Owner/Landlord Only Hearing Notice - Property Owner/Landlord Only Hearing Notice

2/18/2020: Property Owner/Landlord Only Hearing Notice - Property Owner/Landlord Only Hearing Notice

Writ - Return - Writ - Return

9/11/2020: Writ - Return - Writ - Return

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/11/2020
  • DocketWrit - Return ( Unsatisfied);; Costs Credits: 0.00; Interest Credits: 0.00; Principal Credits: 0.00; Possession: No; Judgment Satisfaction Type: Unsatisfied

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2020
  • DocketApplication for Writ of Possession; Filed by: PC RUTHERFORD REALTY CORP. (Plaintiff); Daily Rental Value: 41.66

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2020
  • DocketWrit of Possession; Issued by: PC RUTHERFORD REALTY CORP. (Plaintiff); As to: TREVOR JEVON ERVIN (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2020
  • DocketUpdated -- Proof of Service by Substituted Service: Document changed from Proof of Service by Posting to Proof of Service by Substituted Service; As To Parties: removed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2020
  • DocketDefault judgment by Clerk entered for Plaintiff PC RUTHERFORD REALTY CORP. against Defendant TREVOR JEVON ERVIN on the Complaint filed by PC RUTHERFORD REALTY CORP. on 02/18/2020 for a total of $0.00.; Judgment for possession is granted against all unnamed occupants pursuant to Code of Civil Procedure section 415.46.; Restitution and possession of the premises located at 756 S. Ridgeley Drive #101, Los Angeles, CA 90036 is granted for plaintiff(s)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2020
  • DocketJudgment - Unlawful Detainer; Filed by: PC RUTHERFORD REALTY CORP. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2020
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 04/28/2020 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Civil Clerk's Office Not Held - Vacated by Court on 03/23/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2020
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by: PC RUTHERFORD REALTY CORP. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2020
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: PC RUTHERFORD REALTY CORP. (Plaintiff); As to: TREVOR JEVON ERVIN (Defendant); Service Date: 03/04/2020; Service Cost: 65.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2020
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: PC RUTHERFORD REALTY CORP. (Plaintiff); As to: Unnamed Occupants; Mailing Date: 03/04/2020; Service Cost: 40.00; Service Cost Waived: No; Proof of Mailing Date: 03/04/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2020
  • DocketDefault entered as to TREVOR JEVON ERVIN; unnamed occupants pursuant to CCP 415.46; On the Complaint filed by PC RUTHERFORD REALTY CORP. on 02/18/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2020
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default / Judgment; Filed by: PC RUTHERFORD REALTY CORP. (Plaintiff); As to: Unnamed Occupants; TREVOR JEVON ERVIN (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2020
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 04/28/2020 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Civil Clerk's Office

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2020
  • DocketNotice of Unlawful Detainer mailed 02/24/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Gail Killefer in Department 97 Stanley Mosk Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: PC RUTHERFORD REALTY CORP. (Plaintiff); As to: TREVOR JEVON ERVIN (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2020
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: PC RUTHERFORD REALTY CORP. (Plaintiff); As to: TREVOR JEVON ERVIN (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: PC RUTHERFORD REALTY CORP. (Plaintiff); As to: TREVOR JEVON ERVIN (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2020
  • DocketProperty Owner/Landlord Only Hearing Notice; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer FEINBERG LAURENCE JAY