Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/26/2018 at 22:28:52 (UTC).

PAULETTE LEWIS VS JAMES E SHAW

Case Summary

On 10/27/2017 PAULETTE LEWIS filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against JAMES E SHAW. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is KENJI MACHIDA. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0373

  • Filing Date:

    10/27/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

KENJI MACHIDA

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LEWIS PAULETTE

Los Angeles, CA 90044

Defendant

SHAW JAMES E

Los Angeles, CA 90037

 

Court Documents

Unknown

12/5/2017: Unknown

(Non-Jury Trial)

12/5/2017: (Non-Jury Trial)

Unknown

11/16/2017: Unknown

Unknown

10/27/2017: Unknown

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/05/2017
  • Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2017
  • Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims); Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2017
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 12/05/2017 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 1A updated: Result Date to 12/05/2017; Result Type to Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2017
  • Court orders judgment entered for Plaintiff Paulette Lewis against Defendant James E Shaw on the Plaintiff's Claim filed by Paulette Lewis on 10/27/2017 for the principal amount of $2,069.00 and costs of $90.00 for a total of $2,159.00.; This judgment results from a motor vehicle accident on a California highway and was caused by the judgment debtor's operation of a motor vehicle. If the judgment is not paid, the judgment creditor may apply to have the judgment debtor's drivers license suspended.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2017
  • Proof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: Paulette Lewis (Plaintiff); As to: James E Shaw (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 11/09/2017; Service Cost: 78.56; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2017
  • Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court; Filed by: Paulette Lewis (Plaintiff); As to: James E Shaw (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2017
  • Case assigned to Hon. Kenji Machida in Department 1A Stanley Mosk Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2017
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 12/05/2017 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 1A

    Read MoreRead Less