Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 11/24/2020 at 08:12:45 (UTC).

PAUL BREWSTER VS LEGENDS HOSPITALITY LLC

Case Summary

On 07/15/2020 PAUL BREWSTER filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against LEGENDS HOSPITALITY LLC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is SERENA R. MURILLO. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******5907

  • Filing Date:

    07/15/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Spring Street Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

SERENA R. MURILLO

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BREWSTER PAUL

Defendant

LEGENDS HOSPITALITY LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

NOBLES JAMES E.

 

Court Documents

Summons - Summons on Complaint

7/20/2020: Summons - Summons on Complaint

First Amended Standing Order - First Amended Standing Order

7/15/2020: First Amended Standing Order - First Amended Standing Order

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

7/15/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint - Complaint

7/15/2020: Complaint - Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

7/15/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/19/2023
  • Hearing07/19/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 26 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2022
  • Hearing01/12/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 26 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2020
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Paul Brewster (Plaintiff); As to: Legends Hospitality LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2020
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 01/12/2022 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2020
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 07/19/2023 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Serena R. Murillo in Department 26 Spring Street Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Paul Brewster (Plaintiff); As to: Legends Hospitality LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Paul Brewster (Plaintiff); As to: Legends Hospitality LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2020
  • DocketFirst Amended Standing Order; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where LEGENDS HOSPITALITY LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer NOBLES JAMES E.