This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 03/03/2021 at 08:05:24 (UTC).

PATRICK NOWAK VS BARLOW RESPIRATORY HOSPITAL

Case Summary

On 10/23/2020 PATRICK NOWAK filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against BARLOW RESPIRATORY HOSPITAL. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is JAMES E. BLANCARTE. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******8986

  • Filing Date:

    10/23/2020

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

JAMES E. BLANCARTE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

NOWAK PATRICK DBA NOWAK INSPECTIONS

Defendant

BARLOW RESPIRATORY HOSPITAL

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BOON WILLIAM

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/02/2021
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 04/22/2022 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 02/02/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 10/27/2023 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 02/02/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2021
  • DocketAddress for William Boon (Attorney) null

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2021
  • DocketOn the Complaint filed by Patrick Nowak on 10/23/2020, entered Request for Dismissal without prejudice filed by Patrick Nowak as to the entire action

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2020
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Patrick Nowak (Plaintiff); As to: Barlow Respiratory Hospital (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Patrick Nowak (Plaintiff); As to: Barlow Respiratory Hospital (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Patrick Nowak (Plaintiff); As to: Barlow Respiratory Hospital (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2020
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Patrick Nowak (Plaintiff); As to: Barlow Respiratory Hospital (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2020
  • DocketFirst Amended Standing Order; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2020
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 04/22/2022 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2020
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 10/27/2023 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. James E. Blancarte in Department 25 Spring Street Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where BARLOW RESPIRATORY HOSPITAL is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer BOON WILLIAM