This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 02/19/2021 at 20:29:42 (UTC).

PATRICIA SMITH, ET AL. VS JESSICA MARTINEZ, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 10/21/2020 PATRICIA SMITH filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against JESSICA MARTINEZ. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is JAMES E. BLANCARTE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******8928

  • Filing Date:

    10/21/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Spring Street Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

JAMES E. BLANCARTE

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

SMITH PATRICIA

PITTMAN GAIL

Defendants

MIRANDAALVAREZ WENCESLAO

MARTINEZ JESSICA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

BARRENO ALEXANDRA

Other Attorneys

YEAGER KENNETH

 

Court Documents

Answer - Answer

12/14/2020: Answer - Answer

Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

11/20/2020: Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Mailing (Substituted Service) - Proof of Mailing (Substituted Service)

11/20/2020: Proof of Mailing (Substituted Service) - Proof of Mailing (Substituted Service)

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

10/21/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

First Amended Standing Order - First Amended Standing Order

10/21/2020: First Amended Standing Order - First Amended Standing Order

Complaint - Complaint

10/21/2020: Complaint - Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

10/21/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

Summons - Summons on Complaint

10/22/2020: Summons - Summons on Complaint

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/25/2023
  • Hearing10/25/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 25 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2022
  • Hearing04/20/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 25 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2020
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by: Jessica Denise Garcia Erroneously Sued As Jessica Martinez (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2020
  • DocketProof of Mailing (Substituted Service); Filed by: Patricia Smith (Plaintiff); As to: Wenceslao Mirandaalvarez (Defendant); Mailing Date: 11/03/2020; Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2020
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: Patricia Smith (Plaintiff); As to: Jessica Martinez (Defendant); Service Date: 11/03/2020; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2020
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Patricia Smith (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Patricia Smith (Plaintiff); Gail Pittman (Plaintiff); As to: Jessica Martinez (Defendant); Wenceslao Mirandaalvarez (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Patricia Smith (Plaintiff); Gail Pittman (Plaintiff); As to: Jessica Martinez (Defendant); Wenceslao Mirandaalvarez (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2020
  • DocketFirst Amended Standing Order; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2020
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 04/20/2022 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2020
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 10/25/2023 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. James E. Blancarte in Department 25 Spring Street Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer YEAGER KENNETH