This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/22/2021 at 02:00:38 (UTC).

PATRICIA QUINTERO VS HAWTHORNE AUTO MARKET, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 09/11/2020 PATRICIA QUINTERO filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against HAWTHORNE AUTO MARKET. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is JAMES E. BLANCARTE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******7718

  • Filing Date:

    09/11/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

JAMES E. BLANCARTE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

QUINTERO PATRICIA

Defendants

SURETY

HAWTHORNE AUTO MARKET DBA HAWTHORNE MOTORS EXPRESS

MECHANICS BANK SUCCESSOR BY MERGER WITH CALIFORNIA REPUBLIC BANK

AMERICAN SAFETY CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SADR KASRA

Defendant Attorneys

SMITH JAY

GASCOU CHRISTIAN JEAN

 

Court Documents

Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing on Motion to Compel Motion to Compel Arbitration)

3/10/2021: Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing on Motion to Compel Motion to Compel Arbitration)

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Hearing on Motion to Compel Motion to Compel Arbitration) of 03/10/2021

3/10/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Hearing on Motion to Compel Motion to Compel Arbitration) of 03/10/2021

Notice (name extension) - Notice OF CONTINUED MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION HEARING

3/17/2021: Notice (name extension) - Notice OF CONTINUED MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION HEARING

Declaration (name extension) - Declaration of Nima Heydari In Support of Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Arbitration

4/1/2021: Declaration (name extension) - Declaration of Nima Heydari In Support of Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Arbitration

Declaration (name extension) - Declaration Supplemental Declaration of Nima Heydari in Support of Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Arbitration

4/21/2021: Declaration (name extension) - Declaration Supplemental Declaration of Nima Heydari in Support of Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Arbitration

Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing on Motion to Compel Motion to Compel Arbitration)

5/13/2021: Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing on Motion to Compel Motion to Compel Arbitration)

Notice (name extension) - Notice of Ruling Re Motion to Compel Arbitration

5/14/2021: Notice (name extension) - Notice of Ruling Re Motion to Compel Arbitration

Answer - Answer

12/16/2020: Answer - Answer

Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

11/2/2020: Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

11/2/2020: Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

11/2/2020: Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

Answer - Answer

10/27/2020: Answer - Answer

Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

9/21/2020: Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

Motion to Compel Arbitration - Motion to Compel Arbitration

9/23/2020: Motion to Compel Arbitration - Motion to Compel Arbitration

Declaration (name extension) - Declaration Declaration of Nima Heydari in Support of Petition to Compel Arbitration

9/23/2020: Declaration (name extension) - Declaration Declaration of Nima Heydari in Support of Petition to Compel Arbitration

Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name) - Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

9/21/2020: Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name) - Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

Complaint - Complaint

9/11/2020: Complaint - Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

9/11/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/15/2023
  • Hearing09/15/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 25 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2022
  • Hearing03/11/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 25 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2022
  • Hearing02/01/2022 at 09:30 AM in Department 25 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Post-Arbitration Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2021
  • DocketNotice of Ruling Re Motion to Compel Arbitration; Filed by: Patricia Quintero (Plaintiff); As to: Hawthorne Auto Market (Defendant); Mechanics Bank successor by Merger with California Republic Bank (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2021
  • DocketMinute Order (Hearing on Motion to Compel Motion to Compel Arbitration)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2021
  • DocketHearing on Motion to Compel Motion to Compel Arbitration scheduled for 05/13/2021 at 10:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25 Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Court on 05/13/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2021
  • DocketDeclaration Supplemental Declaration of Nima Heydari in Support of Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Arbitration; Filed by: Patricia Quintero (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2021
  • DocketDeclaration of Nima Heydari In Support of Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Arbitration; Filed by: Patricia Quintero (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2021
  • DocketNotice OF CONTINUED MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION HEARING; Filed by: Patricia Quintero (Plaintiff); As to: Hawthorne Auto Market (Defendant); Mechanics Bank successor by Merger with California Republic Bank (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2021
  • DocketHearing on Motion to Compel Motion to Compel Arbitration scheduled for 05/13/2021 at 10:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25

    Read MoreRead Less
15 More Docket Entries
  • 09/21/2020
  • DocketAddress for Kasra Sadr (Attorney) updated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • DocketOn the Complaint filed by Patricia Quintero on 09/11/2020, entered Request for Dismissal with prejudice filed by Patricia Quintero as to Surety

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2020
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 03/11/2022 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2020
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 09/15/2023 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Patricia Quintero (Plaintiff); As to: Hawthorne Auto Market (Defendant); Mechanics Bank successor by Merger with California Republic Bank (Defendant); Surety (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Patricia Quintero (Plaintiff); As to: Hawthorne Auto Market (Defendant); Mechanics Bank successor by Merger with California Republic Bank (Defendant); Surety (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2020
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Patricia Quintero (Plaintiff); As to: Hawthorne Auto Market (Defendant); Mechanics Bank successor by Merger with California Republic Bank (Defendant); Surety (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2020
  • DocketFirst Amended Standing Order; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. James E. Blancarte in Department 25 Spring Street Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: 20STLC07718    Hearing Date: May 13, 2021    Dept: 25

PROCEEDINGS: MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION, PETITION FOR COURT TO PICK ARBITRATION FORUM, REQUEST FOR STAY, AND REQUEST FOR COSTS

MOVING PARTY: Plaintiff Patricia Quintero

RESP. PARTY: None

MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION

(CCP § 1281.2, et seq.)

TENTATIVE RULING:

Due to the arbitration stay entered on March 10, 2021, Plaintiff’s request for costs is PLACED OFF CALENDAR.

SERVICE:

[X] Proof of Service Timely Filed (CRC, rule 3.1300) OK

[X] Correct Address (CCP §§ 1013, 1013a) OK

[X] 16/21 Court Days Lapsed (CCP §§ 12c, 1005(b)) OK

OPPOSITION: None filed as of May 11, 2021 [ ] Late [X] None

REPLY: None filed as of May 11, 2021 [ ] Late [X] None

ANALYSIS:

I. Background & Discussion

On September 11, 2020, Plaintiff Patricia Quintero (“Plaintiff”) filed this action against Hawthorne Auto Market dba Hawthorne Motors Express (“Hawthorne”), Mechanics Bank, Successor by Merger with California Republic Bank (“Mechanic’s Bank”), and Surety. Plaintiff filed a doe amendment to the Complaint, substituting American Safety Casualty Insurance Company for Doe 1 on September 21, 2020.

Plaintiff filed the instant Motion to Compel Arbitration, Petition for Court to Pick Arbitration Forum, Request for Stay, and Request for Costs (the “Motion”) on September 23, 2020.

Defendant Hudson Insurance Company, erroneously sued as American Safety Casualty Insurance Company (“Hudson”) filed an Answer on October 27, 2020 and Defendant Hawthorne filed its Answer on December 16, 2020. Defendant Mechanics Bank has not yet filed an Answer.

On March 10, 2021, the Court granted Plaintiff’s motion to compel arbitration and for an arbitration stay. (3/10/21 Minute Order.) The Court noted, however, that Plaintiff did not specify the amount of costs sought. (Id.) In error, the Court continued the hearing as to Plaintiff’s request for costs despite the arbitration stay that was issued. (Id.) Because an arbitration stay was entered on March 10, and currently remains in effect, Plaintiff’s request for costs is PLACED OFF CALENDAR. Costs incurred may be sought after the conclusion of the arbitration proceedings if not awarded by an arbitrator.

II. Conclusion & Order

Due to the arbitration stay entered on March 10, 2021, Plaintiff’s request for costs is PLACED OFF CALENDAR.

Moving party is ordered to give notice.

Case Number: 20STLC07718    Hearing Date: March 10, 2021    Dept: 25

HEARING DATE: Wed., March 10, 2021 JUDGE /DEPT: Blancarte/25

CASE NAME: Quintero v. Hawthorne Auto Market, et al. COMP. FILED: 09-11-20

CASE NUMBER: 20STLC07718 DISC. C/O: 02-09-22

NOTICE: OK DISC. MOT. C/O: 02-24-22

TRIAL DATE: 03-11-22

PROCEEDINGS: MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION, PETITION FOR COURT TO PICK ARBITRATION FORUM, REQUEST FOR STAY, AND REQUEST FOR COSTS

MOVING PARTY: Plaintiff Patricia Quintero

RESP. PARTY: None

MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION

(CCP § 1281.2, et seq.)

TENTATIVE RULING:

Plaintiff Patricia Quintero’s Motion to Compel Arbitration, Petition for Court to Pick Arbitration Forum, and Request for Stay is GRANTED as to Defendants Hawthorne Auto Market dba Hawthorne Motors Express and Mechanics Bank Successor by Merger with California Republic Bank. The matter is STAYED and is to be arbitrated before the AAA. In addition, Defendant Mechanics Bank is ordered to reinstate its good standing status with the AAA.

However, Plaintiff’s request for costs is CONTINUED TO MAY 13, 2021 at 10:30 a.m. in Department 25 at the SPRING STREET COURTHOUSE. At least 16 court days before the next scheduled hearing, Plaintiff’s counsel must file and serve a supplemental declaration regarding the costs sought. Failure to do so may result in the request for costs being placed off calendar or denied.

SERVICE:

[X] Proof of Service Timely Filed (CRC, rule 3.1300) OK

[X] Correct Address (CCP §§ 1013, 1013a) OK

[X] 16/21 Court Days Lapsed (CCP §§ 12c, 1005(b)) OK

OPPOSITION: None filed as of March 8, 2021 [ ] Late [X] None

REPLY: None filed as of March 8, 2021 [ ] Late [X] None

ANALYSIS:

  1. Background

On September 11, 2020, Plaintiff Patricia Quintero (“Plaintiff”) filed this action against Hawthorne Auto Market dba Hawthorne Motors Express (“Hawthorne”), Mechanics Bank, Successor by Merger with California Republic Bank (“Mechanic’s Bank”), and Surety. Plaintiff filed a doe amendment to the Complaint, substituting American Safety Casualty Insurance Company for Doe 1 on September 21, 2020.

Plaintiff filed the instant Motion to Compel Arbitration, Petition for Court to Pick Arbitration Forum, Request for Stay, and Request for Costs (the “Motion”) on September 23, 2020.

Defendant Hudson Insurance Company, erroneously sued as American Safety Casualty Insurance Company (“Hudson”) filed an Answer on October 27, 2020 and Defendant Hawthorne filed its Answer on December 16, 2020. Defendant Mechanics Bank has not yet filed an Answer.

No oppositions to the Motion were filed.

  1. Legal Standard

“On petition of a party to an arbitration agreement alleging the existence of a written agreement to arbitrate a controversy and that a party to the agreement refuses to arbitrate that controversy, the court shall order the petitioner and the respondent to arbitrate the controversy if it determines that an agreement to arbitrate the controversy exists, unless it determines that: (a) The right to compel arbitration has been waived by the petitioner; or (b) Grounds exist for rescission of the agreement.” (Code Civ. Proc., §§ 1281.2(a)-(b).) As with other types of agreements, “[t]he failure of the [party] to carefully read the agreement and the amendment is not a reason to refuse to enforce the arbitration provisions.” (Powers v. Dickson, Carlson & Campillo (1997) 54 Cal.App.4th 1102, 1115.) “California law, ‘like [federal law], reflects a strong policy favoring arbitration agreements and requires close judicial scrutiny of waiver claims.’” (Wagner Const. Co. v. Pacific Mechanical Corp. (2007) 41 Cal.4th 19, 31.) If the court orders arbitration, then the court shall stay the action until arbitration is completed. (See Code Civ. Proc., § 1281.4.)

  1. Discussion

Plaintiff brings this Motion seeking to compel Defendants Hawthorne and Mechanics Bank to submit to arbitration based on the provisions of the parties’ contract. (Mot., pp. 1-2.)

Plaintiff purchased a vehicle from Defendant Hawthorne pursuant to a written Retail Installment Sale Contract (the “RISC”). (Mot., p. 3:5-8.) The RISC was later assigned to Defendant Mechanics Bank. (Id.) As to any holder, the RISC provides:

“NOTICE: ANY HOLDER OF THIS CONSUMER CREDIT CONTRACT IS SUBJECT TO ALL CLAIMS AND DEFENSES WHICH THE DEBTOR COULD ASSERT AGAINST THE SELLER OF GOODS OR SERVICES OBTAINED PURSUANT HERETO OR WITH THE PROCEEDS HEREOF.”

(Id., Heydari Decl., ¶ 3, Exh. 1.)

The RISC also contains an arbitration provision, which states, in pertinent part:

“EITHER YOU OR WE MAY CHOOSE TO HAVE ANY DISPUTE BETWEEN YOU AND US DECIDED BY ARBITRATION, AND NOT BY A COURT OR BY JURY TRIAL…Any dispute, whether in contract, tort, statute or otherwise (including the interpretation and scope of this Arbitration Provision, and the arbitrability of the claim or dispute), between you and us, our employees, agents, successors or assigns, which arises out of or relates to your credit application, purchase or condition of this vehicle, this contract or any resulting transaction or relationship…shall at your or our election be resolved by neutral binding arbitration and not by court action…”

(Id.) The RISC further provides that parties may choose the American Arbitration Association (the “AAA”) or any other organization to conduct the arbitration subject to the holder’s approval. (Id.)

Plaintiff’s Complaint arises from the condition of the vehicle (Compl., ¶¶ 16-39), so it is subject to arbitration. Plaintiff’s counsel provides evidence that, on January 8, 2020, her office sent Defendant Hawthorne and Defendant Mechanics Bank a letter regarding the action, which included a demand to arbitrate the matter should they not settle within thirty days. (Mot., Heydari Decl., ¶ 4, Exh. 2.) Thus, the Court finds Plaintiff demonstrated the existence of a valid arbitration agreement. Notably, neither Defendant Hawthorne nor Defendant Mechanics Bank has filed an opposition to this Motion demonstrating a defense to its enforcement exists.

Plaintiff did not receive an agreement to arbitrate from Defendants. (Id. at ¶ 6.) On or around April 20, 2020, Plaintiff’s office filed for arbitration of this matter with AAA. (Id. at ¶ 7.) Plaintiff’s counsel also provides evidence that on or around August 5, 2020, her office received a letter from the AAA indicating that, due to Defendant Mechanic Bank’s failure to comply with AAA’s policies, AAA closed its file. (Id. at ¶ 8, Exh. 3.) Plaintiff argues, however, that AAA agrees to re-open matters as long as the business complies with its policies and pays any required fees. (Mot., p. 6:4-17.) Defendant Mechanics Bank is ordered to comply with AAA’s policies and requirements so that this matter may be reinstated and arbitrated by the AAA.

Plaintiff also seeks costs as a result of unnecessarily having to bring this Motion due to Defendants’ refusal to arbitrate the matter. (Mot., p. 7:6-20.) “The court shall award costs upon any judicial proceeding under this title as provided in Chapter 6 (commencing with Section 1021) of Title 14 of Part 2 of this code.” (Code Civ. Proc., § 1293.2.) “A petition to compel arbitration under section 1281.2 is a judicial proceeding covered by this provision.” (Otay River Constructors v. San Diego Expressway (2008) 158 Cal.App.4th 796, 805.)

However, Plaintiff’s Motion does not specify the amount of costs sought. Thus, Plaintiff’s counsel is ordered to file and serve a supplemental declaration detailing the costs incurred in this filing this Motion.

  1. Conclusion & Order

For the foregoing reasons, Plaintiff Patricia Quintero’s Motion to Compel Arbitration, Petition for Court to Pick Arbitration Forum, and Request for Stay is GRANTED as to Defendants Hawthorne Auto Market dba Hawthorne Motors Express and Mechanics Bank Successor by Merger with California Republic Bank. The matter is STAYED and is to be arbitrated before the AAA. In addition, Defendant Mechanics Bank is ordered to reinstate its good standing status with the AAA.

However, Plaintiff’s request for costs is CONTINUED TO MAY 13, 2021 at 10:30 a.m. in Department 25 at the SPRING STREET COURTHOUSE. At least 16 court days before the next scheduled hearing, Plaintiff’s counsel must file and serve a supplemental declaration regarding the costs sought. Failure to do so may result in the request for costs being placed off calendar or denied.

Moving party is ordered to give notice.

related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where HAWTHORNE MOTORS EXPRESS is a litigant

Latest cases where MECHANICS BANK is a litigant

Latest cases where SURETY is a litigant

Latest cases where American Safety Casualty Insurance Company, is a litigant