This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 04/15/2013 at 13:00:30 (UTC).

Patel, Priti Vs. New Cingular Wireless Services

Case Summary

On 02/28/2013 a Small Claim - Other Small Claim case was filed by Patel Priti against New Cingular Wireless Services in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Beverly Hills Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****0292

  • Filing Date:

    02/28/2013

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Beverly Hills Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Defendant

At& T Inc. Aka At&t C/O Ct Corporation Ag

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/08/2013
  • CASE FILE FORWARDED TO DEPT 005 RE: COURT SCHEDULED ON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2013
  • AT 130P IN DEPT 005. .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2013
  • CERTIFIED MAIL RETURN RECEIPT FILED. SIGNED BY RUDYRIVERA ON BEHALF OF (NEW CINGULAR WIRELESS SERVICES,INC.) C/O CT CORPORATION SYSTEM AGENT FOR SERVICE .70112970 0002 7545 0127

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2013
  • AMENDMENT TO DEFENDANT'S NAME FILED INSERTING IN PLACEAND STEAD OF INCORRECT/FICTITIOUS NAME AT & T MOBILITYTHE TRUE NAME OF NEW CINGULAR WIRELESS SERVICES, INC. .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2013
  • COPY OF PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM AND ORDER TO DEFENDANT MAILED BYCERTIFIED MAIL TO DEFENDANT(S) (NEW CINGULAR WIRELESSSERVICES, INC.) C/O CT CORPORATION SYSTEM AGENT FORSERVICE . RECEIPT # BH458341010 . 7011 2970 0002 75450127

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2013
  • AMENDMENT TO DEFENDANT'S NAME FILED INSERTING IN PLACEAND STEAD OF INCORRECT/FICTITIOUS NAME AT&T INC. AKAAT&T) THE TRUE NAME OF AT&T MOBILITY .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2013
  • LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE RE: LETTER ADVISING THAT AT&T ISNOT LISTED ON CT CORP.'S RECORDS OR ON THE RECORDS OF THESTATE OF CALIFORNIA. RECEIVED FROM CT CORPORATION, PRITIPATEL AND PLACED INTO CASE FILE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2013
  • CERTIFIED MAIL RETURN RECEIPT FILED. SIGNED BY CTCORPORATION SYSTEM ON BEHALF OF (AT& T INC.) AKA (AT&T)C/O CT CORPORATION AGENT FOR SERVICE . 7011 2970 00027544 7837

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2013
  • COPY OF PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM AND ORDER TO DEFENDANT MAILED BYCERTIFIED MAIL TO DEFENDANT(S) (AT& T INC.) AKA (AT&T)C/O CT CORPORATION AGENT FOR SERVICE . RECEIPT #BH458341005 . 7011 2970 0002 7544 7837

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2013
  • PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM AND ORDER TO DEFENDANT FILED. RECEIPT #BH458341005 . HEARING SET FOR 04/18/13 AT 01:30P M,IN DEPT. 005

    Read MoreRead Less