This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/19/2018 at 23:20:16 (UTC).

PASADENA GARDENING & TREE SERV VS NETTLES, VICTORIA

Case Summary

On 02/19/2013 PASADENA GARDENING TREE SERV filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against NETTLES, VICTORIA. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Alhambra Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is JEFFREY WINIKOW. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****0180

  • Filing Date:

    02/19/2013

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Courthouse:

    Alhambra Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

JEFFREY WINIKOW

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PASADENA GARDENING & TREE SERVICE SINGLE OWNER BUSINESS

Defendant

NETTLES VICTORIA DBA LAMPASONA

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/26/2015
  • CASE FILE ORDERED DESTROYED PER SECTION(S) 71008 AND/OR 68152 OF THE GOVERNMENT CODE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2013
  • MINUTE ORDER AND CLERK'S NOTICE OF RULING MAILED TO ALL PARTIES. CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2013
  • CASE FILE RETURNED TO SMALL CLAIMS OFFICE FROM COURTROOM .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2013
  • * EFFECTIVE 05/28/2013

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2013
  • * CASE REASSIGNED TO THE ALHAMBRA COURTHOUSE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2013
  • * CASE RENUMBERED FROM PAS13S00180 TO ALH13SP0180

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2013
  • CAUSE CALLED AT 08:30A M, IN DEPT. NEN , HON. JEFFREY WINIKOW, JUDGE PRESIDING FOR SMALL CLAIMS HEARING. NO APPEARANCE BY OR FOR EITHER PARTY. THE COURT ORDERS CASE DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2013
  • MATTER RE-SCHEDULED FOR SMALL CLAIMS HEARING ON 04/26/13 AT 08:30A M, IN DEPT. NEN .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2013
  • PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM AND ORDER TO DEFENDANT FILED. RN 1130219E0403. HEARING SET FOR 03/26/13 AT 08:30 AM IN DPT. NEN.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where PASADENA GARDENING & TREE SERVICE SINGLE OWNER BUSINESS is a litigant