This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/24/2016 at 12:23:49 (UTC).

PARKING VIOLATIONS BUREAU VS HILL, C DICKINSON

Case Summary

On 04/19/2013 PARKING VIOLATIONS BUREAU filed an Infraction - Parking lawsuit against HILL, C DICKINSON. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****5046

  • Filing Date:

    04/19/2013

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Infraction - Parking

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PARKING VIOLATIONS BUREAU

Defendant

HILL C DICKINSON

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

PARKING VIOLATIONS BUREAU

CITY OF SANTA MONICA

Defendant Attorney

HILL, C DICKINSON

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/25/2015
  • CASE DESTROYED PURSUANT TO GC 68152 D(1)/GC 68152 D(2)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2013
  • NOTICE OF DECISION - ADMINISTRATIVE APPEAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2013
  • A/C - ATTORNEY UPDATE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2013
  • CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE MAILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2013
  • POS BY MAIL/PARKING APPEAL FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2013
  • HEARING DATE SET FOR 06/12/13, 01:30 PM, DEPT 77

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2013
  • A/C - COMPLAINT FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2013
  • PARKING APPEAL FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2013
  • APPEAL FROM ADMINISTRATIVE DECISION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2013
  • SUMMONS FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2013
  • RESPONSE FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2013
  • PARKING CITATION NO 905240626

    Read MoreRead Less