Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/16/2019 at 06:43:43 (UTC).

PARK CIRCLE APTS., INC. VS BRITTANY ALLEN, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 08/10/2017 PARK CIRCLE APTS , INC filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against BRITTANY ALLEN. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Michael Antonovich Antelope Valley Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is JOEL L. LOFTON. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0079

  • Filing Date:

    08/10/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Michael Antonovich Antelope Valley Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

JOEL L. LOFTON

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PARK CIRCLE APTS. INC.

Defendants

ALLEN BRITTANY

Lancaster, CA 93535

ALLEN MARY

Lancaster, CA 93535

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

EVANS CHRIS JAMES

 

Court Documents

Writ of Execution - (Los Angeles)

10/5/2017: Writ of Execution - (Los Angeles)

Writ - Return

10/23/2017: Writ - Return

Default Judgment - Unlawful Detainer

9/5/2017: Default Judgment - Unlawful Detainer

Complaint

8/10/2017: Complaint

Summons - on Complaint

8/10/2017: Summons - on Complaint

Property Owner/Landlord Only Hearing Notice

8/10/2017: Property Owner/Landlord Only Hearing Notice

Civil Case Cover Sheet

8/10/2017: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Application for Writ of Possession

9/21/2017: Application for Writ of Possession

Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) - (Brittany Allen)

8/10/2017: Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) - (Brittany Allen)

Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) - (ALL OCCUPANTS)

8/10/2017: Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) - (ALL OCCUPANTS)

Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) - (Mary Allen)

8/10/2017: Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) - (Mary Allen)

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

8/10/2017: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/23/2017
  • DocketWrit - Return ( Wholly Satisfied); Non-Party; Costs Credits: 0.00; Interest Credits: 0.00; Principal Credits: 0.00; Possession: Yes; Judgment Satisfaction Type: Wholly Satisfied

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2017
  • DocketUpdated -- Writ of Execution (Los Angeles): Result: Returned and Filed; Result Date: 10/23/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2017
  • DocketWrit of Execution (Los Angeles); Issued by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2017
  • DocketApplication for Writ of Possession; Filed by: PARK CIRCLE APTS., INC. (Plaintiff); Daily Rental Value: 32.05

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2017
  • DocketOSC - Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 02/06/2018 at 08:30 AM in at Department A22 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 09/20/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2017
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: PARK CIRCLE APTS., INC. (Plaintiff); As to: Mary Allen (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 08/15/2017; Service Cost: 35.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2017
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: PARK CIRCLE APTS., INC. (Plaintiff); As to: Brittany Allen (Defendant); Service Date: 08/15/2017; Service Cost: 35.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2017
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: PARK CIRCLE APTS., INC. (Plaintiff); As to: Unnamed Occupants; Proof of Mailing Date: 08/15/2017; Service Cost: 25.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2017
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default / Judgment; Filed by: PARK CIRCLE APTS., INC. (Plaintiff); As to: Unnamed Occupants; Brittany Allen (Defendant); Mary Allen (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2017
  • DocketDefault entered as to Brittany Allen; Mary Allen; unnamed occupants pursuant to CCP 415.46; On the Complaint filed by PARK CIRCLE APTS., INC. on 08/10/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 09/05/2017
  • DocketDefault Judgment - Unlawful Detainer; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2017
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: PARK CIRCLE APTS., INC. (Plaintiff); As to: Brittany Allen (Defendant); Mary Allen (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2017
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: PARK CIRCLE APTS., INC. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2017
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2017
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2017
  • DocketProperty Owner/Landlord Only Hearing Notice; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2017
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Joel L. Lofton in Department A22 Michael Antonovich Antelope Valley Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2017
  • DocketOSC - Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 09/25/2017 at 08:30 AM in Michael Antonovich Antelope Valley Courthouse at Department A22

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2017
  • DocketOn the Court's own motion, OSC - Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 09/25/2017 at 08:30 AM in at Department A22 Not Held - Continued - Court's Motion to 02/06/2018 08:30 AM at 02/06/2018 8:30 AM OSC - Failure to File Proof of Service in Department A22

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2017
  • DocketNotice of Unlawful Detainer mailed 08/11/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where PARK CIRCLE APTS. INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer EVANS CHRIS