This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/18/2019 at 00:51:49 (UTC).

PARIS PHIFER VS BIG TICKET ENTERTAINMENT HOT BENCH PRODUCERS

Case Summary

On 02/05/2019 a Other - Arbitration case was filed by PARIS PHIFER against BIG TICKET ENTERTAINMENT HOT BENCH PRODUCERS in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0321

  • Filing Date:

    02/05/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Arbitration

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

WENDY CHANG

 

Party Details

Petitioner

PHIFER PARIS

Respondent

BIG TICKET ENTERTAINMENT HOT BENCH PRODUCERS

 

Court Documents

Proof of Service by Mail - Proof of Service by Mail

6/14/2019: Proof of Service by Mail - Proof of Service by Mail

Proof of Service (Sister State Judgment) - Proof of Service (Sister State Judgment)

6/14/2019: Proof of Service (Sister State Judgment) - Proof of Service (Sister State Judgment)

Opposition (name extension) - Opposition to Petition to Correct Contractual Arbitration Award; Declaration of Thu-Huong M. Duong

7/2/2019: Opposition (name extension) - Opposition to Petition to Correct Contractual Arbitration Award; Declaration of Thu-Huong M. Duong

Order - Dismissal - Order - Dismissal

7/16/2019: Order - Dismissal - Order - Dismissal

Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing on Petition Petition (name extension))

7/16/2019: Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing on Petition Petition (name extension))

Notice of Ruling - Notice of Ruling

7/16/2019: Notice of Ruling - Notice of Ruling

Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing on Petition to Correct Contractual Arbitration Award)

6/11/2019: Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing on Petition to Correct Contractual Arbitration Award)

Notice of Hearing on Petition - Notice of Hearing on Petition

2/5/2019: Notice of Hearing on Petition - Notice of Hearing on Petition

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

2/5/2019: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

Petition (name extension) - Contractual Arbitration Award

2/5/2019: Petition (name extension) - Contractual Arbitration Award

First Amended Standing Order - First Amended Standing Order

2/5/2019: First Amended Standing Order - First Amended Standing Order

Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court) - Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)

2/5/2019: Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court) - Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/16/2019
  • Order - Dismissal; Filed by: Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2019
  • Hearing on Petition Petition (name extension) scheduled for 09/24/2019 at 09:00 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 94

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2019
  • On the Petition filed by Paris Phifer on 02/05/2019, entered Order for Dismissal without prejudice as to Big Ticket entertainment Hot Bench Producers, pursuant to Code of Civil Procedures Section 1287.2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2019
  • Notice of Ruling; Filed by: Big Ticket entertainment Hot Bench Producers (Respondent)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2019
  • Minute Order (Hearing on Petition Petition (name extension))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2019
  • On the Court's own motion, Hearing on Petition Petition (name extension) scheduled for 07/16/2019 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 94 Held - Continued was rescheduled to 09/24/2019 09:00 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2019
  • Opposition to Petition to Correct Contractual Arbitration Award; Declaration of Thu-Huong M. Duong; Filed by: Big Ticket entertainment Hot Bench Producers (Respondent)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2019
  • Proof of Service by Mail; Filed by: Paris Phifer (Petitioner); As to: Big Ticket entertainment Hot Bench Producers (Respondent); After Substituted Service of Summons & Complaint ?: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2019
  • Proof of Service (Sister State Judgment); Filed by: Big Ticket entertainment Hot Bench Producers (Respondent); As to: Paris Phifer (Petitioner); Service Date: 06/11/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2019
  • The case is placed in special status of: Stay - Other

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 06/11/2019
  • On the Court's own motion, Hearing on Petition Petition (name extension) scheduled for 06/11/2019 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 94 Held - Continued was rescheduled to 07/16/2019 08:30 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2019
  • Hearing on Petition Petition (name extension) scheduled for 07/16/2019 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 94

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2019
  • Contractual Arbitration Award; Filed by: Paris Phifer (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2019
  • Request to Waive Court Fees; Filed by: Paris Phifer (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2019
  • Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court); Signed and Filed by: Clerk; As to: Paris Phifer (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2019
  • Notice of Hearing on Petition; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2019
  • Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2019
  • First Amended Standing Order; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2019
  • Case assigned to Hon. Wendy Chang in Department 94 Stanley Mosk Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2019
  • Hearing on Petition Petition (name extension) scheduled for 06/11/2019 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 94

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: 19STCP00321    Hearing Date: November 14, 2019    Dept: 94

PETITION TO CORRECT ARBITRATION

(CCP § 1286.6)

TENTATIVE RULING:

For the reasons stated below, Petitioner Paris Phifer’s Petition to Correct Contractual Arbitration Award is DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE.

SERVICE: WAIVED BY RESPONDENT AT THE LAST HEARING

ANALYSIS:

I. Discussion

On February 5, 2019, Petitioner Paris Phifer (“Petitioner”) filed this Petition to Correct Contractual Arbitration Award against Respondent Big Ticket Pictures, Inc. (erroneously named as “Big Ticket Entertainment Hot Bench Producers”) (“Respondent”).

At the first hearing, the Court continued the Petition to afford Petitioner an opportunity to file Supplemental Papers to address various procedural issues, which Petitioner did on June 14, 2019. At the second hearing, the Court found that Petitioner failed to “name as respondents all parties to the arbitration and may name as respondents any other persons bound by the arbitration award” as required by CCP § 1285. In particular, the Court noted that the Arbitration Award showed that the parties to the arbitration proceeding were Petitioner and Shawn Johnson (“Mr. Johnson”), and Respondent named in this Petition was not a party to the arbitration proceeding. (Oppo., Exh. C.)

Mr. Johnson still has not been named to the Petition and has not been properly served with the Notice of Petition and Petition in the same manner as a summons as required by CCP § 1290.4. “Due process ‘guarantees that any person against whom a claim is asserted in a judicial proceeding shall have the opportunity to be heard and to present his defenses.’ [Citation.]” (Greenspan v. LADT, LLC (2010) 191 Cal.App.4th 486, 509.) Because Mr. Johnson has not been named and has not been afforded his due process, the Court cannot consider the Petition at this time.

II. Conclusion & Order

For the stated reasons, the Petition is DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE.

Court clerk is ordered to give notice.