This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/28/2017 at 05:35:39 (UTC).

PARALEGAL GROUP CENTER VS MALEK, MASOUD

Case Summary

On 01/26/2016 PARALEGAL GROUP CENTER filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against MALEK, MASOUD. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Inglewood Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****0173

  • Filing Date:

    01/26/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Courthouse:

    Inglewood Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PARALEGAL GROUP CENTER

Defendants

MALEK MASOUD

Beverly Hills, CA 90211

BEVERLY HILLS SURGICAL CENTER LLC

 

Court Documents

Minute Order of 06/06/2016 and Judgment Debtor Statement of Assets

6/6/2016: Minute Order of 06/06/2016 and Judgment Debtor Statement of Assets

Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)

6/6/2016: Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/29/2016
  • Minute Order (Notice of Motion to Vacate Judgment and Declaration)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2016
  • Updated -- Notice of Motion to Vacate Judgment and Declaration: Result: Result Date: 07/29/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2016
  • Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order of 07/29/2016; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2016
  • Updated -- Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims): Result: Vacated; Result Date: 07/29/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2016
  • Hearing on Motion to Set Aside/Vacate Judgment scheduled for 07/29/2016 at 01:30 PM in Inglewood Courthouse at Department 8 updated: Result Date to 07/29/2016; Result Type to Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2016
  • Order for dismissal Without Prejudice entered as to entire action , pursuant to 664.6

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2016
  • Updated -- On the Plaintiff's Claim filed by PARALEGAL GROUP CENTER on 01/26/2016 (from ING16S00173), judgment entered on 06/06/2016 is vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2016
  • On the Plaintiff's Claim filed by PARALEGAL GROUP CENTER on 01/26/2016 (from ING16S00173), judgment entered on 06/06/2016 as to MASOUD MALEK is vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2016
  • Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims); Filed by: (PARALEGAL GROUP CENTER) (Plaintiff); MASOUD MALEK (Defendant); (BEVERLY HILLS SURGICAL CENTER, LLC) (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2016
  • Stipulation and Order Appointing Member of State Bar as Temporary Judge; Filed by:

    Read MoreRead Less
6 More Docket Entries
  • 06/06/2016
  • Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims); Filed by: Non-Party

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2016
  • Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2016
  • Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order of 06/06/2016 and Judgment Debtor Statement of Assets; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2016
  • Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims); Entered by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2016
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 06/06/2016 at 01:30 PM in Inglewood Courthouse at Department 8 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 06/06/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2016
  • RECEIVED FEES FROM (PARALEGAL GROUP CENTER) IN THE SUM OF $ 2.25 FOR FAX FILING OF PROOF OF SERVICE . RECEIPT # ING208268015

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2016
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM FILED. SERVED AS TO (MALEK, MASOUD) BY SUB-SERVING WHITE LADY - BLOND . MATTER SET FOR HEARING ON 06/06/16 AT 01:30P M, IN DEPT. SW8 COSTS OF $ 50.00 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2016
  • PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST FOR POSTPONEMENT (BEFORE SERVICE) FILED .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2016
  • MATTER RE-SCHEDULED FOR SMALL CLAIMS HEARING ON 06/06/16 AT 01:30P M, IN DEPT. SW8 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2016
  • PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM AND ORDER TO DEFENDANT FILED. RN ING478405004. HEARING SET FOR 04/05/16 AT 01:30 PM IN DPT. SW8.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where THE BEVERLY HILLS SURGICAL CENTER INC. is a litigant