Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/19/2019 at 01:30:42 (UTC).

PARADISE SANTIFER VS CORBETT BURNS

Case Summary

On 09/10/2018 a Small Claim - Other Small Claim case was filed by PARADISE SANTIFER against CORBETT BURNS in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Compton Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2278

  • Filing Date:

    09/10/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Compton Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

VICTOR M. ACEVEDO

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SANTIFER PARADISE

Defendant

BURNS CORBETT

 

Court Documents

Request for Dismissal

10/11/2018: Request for Dismissal

Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims)

9/14/2018: Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims)

Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)

9/10/2018: Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)

Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

9/10/2018: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/11/2018
  • Request for Dismissal; Filed by: Paradise Santifer (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2018
  • On the Plaintiff's Claim filed by Paradise Santifer on 09/10/2018, entered Request for Dismissal with prejudice filed by Paradise Santifer as to the entire action

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2018
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 10/16/2018 at 08:30 AM in Compton Courthouse at Department 7 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 10/11/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2018
  • Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims); Filed by: Paradise Santifer (Plaintiff); As to: Corbett Burns (Defendant); Service Cost: 40.00; Service Cost Waived: Yes; Service Date: 09/12/18

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2018
  • Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court; Filed by: Paradise Santifer (Plaintiff); As to: Corbett Burns (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2018
  • Request to Waive Court Fees; Filed by: Paradise Santifer (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2018
  • Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court); Signed and Filed by: Clerk; As to: Paradise Santifer (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2018
  • Case assigned to Hon. Victor M. Acevedo in Department 7 Compton Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2018
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 10/16/2018 at 08:30 AM in Compton Courthouse at Department 7

    Read MoreRead Less