This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 04/18/2021 at 04:48:38 (UTC).

PAMELA BROUSSARD VS DIVERSIFIED ACCEPTANCE CORPORATION DBA M. LEONARD & ASSOCIATES

Case Summary

On 08/02/2019 PAMELA BROUSSARD filed an Other lawsuit against DIVERSIFIED ACCEPTANCE CORPORATION DBA M LEONARD ASSOCIATES. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is SERENA R. MURILLO. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******7172

  • Filing Date:

    08/02/2019

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Courthouse:

    Spring Street Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

SERENA R. MURILLO

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BROUSSARD PAMELA

Defendant

DIVERSIFIED ACCEPTANCE CORPORATION DBA M. LEONARD & ASSOCIATES

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

FRIEDMAN TODD

FRIEDMAN TODD M.

 

Court Documents

Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

2/19/2021: Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

1/20/2021: Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment - Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

1/28/2021: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment - Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment - Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

1/28/2021: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment - Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment - Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment

1/28/2021: Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment - Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment

Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

1/29/2021: Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Non-Jury Trial) of 01/29/2021

1/29/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Non-Jury Trial) of 01/29/2021

Summons - Summons on Complaint

8/2/2019: Summons - Summons on Complaint

Complaint - Complaint

8/2/2019: Complaint - Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

8/2/2019: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

First Amended Standing Order - First Amended Standing Order

8/2/2019: First Amended Standing Order - First Amended Standing Order

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

8/2/2019: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/22/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Entry of Default scheduled for 04/16/2021 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 02/22/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2021
  • DocketOn the Complaint filed by PAMELA BROUSSARD on 08/02/2019, entered Request for Dismissal without prejudice filed by PAMELA BROUSSARD as to the entire action

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2021
  • DocketUpdated -- Todd M. Friedman (Attorney): Organization Name: Law Offices of Todd M. Friedman, P.C. Middle Name: M.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2021
  • DocketAddress for Todd M. Friedman (Attorney) null

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Entry of Default scheduled for 04/16/2021 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2021
  • DocketMinute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for (Non-Jury Trial) of 01/29/2021; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2021
  • DocketOn the Court's own motion, Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 01/29/2021 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26 Not Held - Advanced and Vacated on 01/29/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2021
  • DocketOn the Court's own motion, Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 08/05/2022 at 10:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26 Not Held - Advanced and Vacated on 01/29/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2021
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default / Judgment; Filed by: PAMELA BROUSSARD (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 01/28/2021
  • DocketDefault entered as to DIVERSIFIED ACCEPTANCE CORPORATION DBA M. LEONARD & ASSOCIATES; On the Complaint filed by PAMELA BROUSSARD on 08/02/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2021
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: PAMELA BROUSSARD (Plaintiff); As to: DIVERSIFIED ACCEPTANCE CORPORATION DBA M. LEONARD & ASSOCIATES (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 08/07/2019; Service Cost: 100.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2019
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 01/29/2021 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 94

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2019
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 08/05/2022 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 94

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2019
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Serena R. Murillo in Department 94 Stanley Mosk Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2019
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: PAMELA BROUSSARD (Plaintiff); As to: DIVERSIFIED ACCEPTANCE CORPORATION DBA M. LEONARD & ASSOCIATES (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2019
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: PAMELA BROUSSARD (Plaintiff); As to: DIVERSIFIED ACCEPTANCE CORPORATION DBA M. LEONARD & ASSOCIATES (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2019
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: PAMELA BROUSSARD (Plaintiff); As to: DIVERSIFIED ACCEPTANCE CORPORATION DBA M. LEONARD & ASSOCIATES (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2019
  • DocketFirst Amended Standing Order; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where DIVERSIFIED ACCEPTANCE CORPORATION DBA M. LEONARD & ASSOCIATES is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer FRIEDMAN TODD M.