This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 02/28/2017 at 06:19:54 (UTC).

PALMER/FLOWER STREET PROPERTIES LP VS ALSHMMARI, OTHMAN

Case Summary

On 12/16/2016 PALMER/FLOWER STREET PROPERTIES LP filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against ALSHMMARI, OTHMAN. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****4593

  • Filing Date:

    12/16/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PALMER/FLOWER STREET PROPERTIES LP

Defendant

ALSHMMARI OTHMAN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

KIMBALL TIREY & ST JOHN LLP

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/14/2017
  • A/C - COMPLAINT FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2017
  • WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED-RETURNED TO ATTY SVC/VKB

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2017
  • WRIT OF POSSESSION OF REAL PROPERTY ISSUED TO LA COUNTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2017
  • APPLICATION FOR ISSUANCE OF WRIT FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2017
  • HEARING DELETED - OFF CALENDAR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2017
  • DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY CLERK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2017
  • PROOF OF SERVICE TO COMPLAINT FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2017
  • REQUEST FOR DEFAULT FILED AND ENTERED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2017
  • SUBMISSION FOR DEFAULT AND JUDGMENT PENDING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2016
  • APPLICATION TO POST/ORDER SIGNED/FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2016
  • RECEIVED APPLICATION TO POST

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2016
  • NOTICE OF UNLAWFUL DETAINER MAILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2016
  • OSC SET 06/14/17, 08:30 AM, DEPT. CLK PURSUANT TO GENERAL ORDER * * DELETED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2016
  • COMPLAINT FILED - U.D. RESIDENTIAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2016
  • SUMMONS FILED

    Read MoreRead Less