This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/16/2017 at 06:06:23 (UTC).

PALMDALE 112, LTD. VS. BROWN, CEDRIC

Case Summary

On 05/05/2017 PALMDALE 112, LTD filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against BROWN, CEDRIC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Michael Antonovich Antelope Valley Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is RANDOLPH A. ROGERS. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****0721

  • Filing Date:

    05/05/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Michael Antonovich Antelope Valley Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

RANDOLPH A. ROGERS

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PALMDALE 112 LTD. A CALIFORNIA LIMITED PARTNERSHIP

Defendant

BROWN CEDRIC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

RUZICKA & WALLACE - DESS RICHARDSON ESQ

Attorney at RUZICKA & WALLACE

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/22/2017
  • WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED TO LOS ANGELES COUNTY. RECEIPT # PAID . SASE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2017
  • JUDGMENT DEFAULT BY CLERK, CCP 1169, RESTITUTION OF THE PREMISES ONLY ENTERED AS FOLLOWS:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2017
  • JUDGMENT ENTERED ON 05/18/17 , FOR (PALMDALE 112, LTD.) A CALIFORNIA LIMITED PARTNERSHIP , AGAINST (BROWN, CEDRIC) , FOR RESTITUTION OF THE PREMISES LOCATED AT: 38722 11TH STREET #19 PALMDALE, CA 93550 , AND POSSESSION APPLIES TO ANY AND ALL UNNAMED OCCUPANTS IN THE PREMISES PURSUANT TO C.C.P. 415.46.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2017
  • PROOF OF SERVICE RE: SUMMONS, COMPLAINT, PREJUDGMENT CLAIM OF RIGHT TO POSSESSION FILED. SERVED AS TO (BROWN, CEDRIC) PER 05/05/17 . COSTS OF $ 135.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2017
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT; PREJUDGMENT CLAIM OF RIGHT TO POSSESSION FILED AS TO ANY AND ALL OCCUPANTS 05/05/17 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2017
  • REQUEST FILED AND DEFAULT ENTERED OF (BROWN, CEDRIC) , ANY AND ALL OCCUPANTS . DECLARATION UNDER 585.5 CCP, DECLARATION PURSUANT TO 587 CCP, MEMO OF COSTS, AND DECLARATION OF NON-MILITARY STATUS FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2017
  • APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION OF REAL PROPERTY FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2017
  • NOTICE OF UNLAWFUL DETAINER FILING MAILED TO RESPECTIVE PARTIES/COUNSEL. CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2017
  • UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED. RN 06.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2017
  • SUMMONS ISSUED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2017
  • SUMMONS FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2017
  • NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT ON FILE. CASE IS ASSIGNED TO DEPT. A15 , HONORABLE RANDOLPH A. ROGERS .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2017
  • MATTER SET FOR UNLAWFUL DETAINER ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING ON 11/02/17 AT 08:30A M, IN DEPARTMENT A15 . .

    Read MoreRead Less