This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/05/2017 at 17:40:25 (UTC).

PACTRUX INC VS JDH PACIFIC, INC.

Case Summary

On 04/04/2017 PACTRUX INC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against JDH PACIFIC, INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Downey Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is MICHAEL J. PEARCE. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3635

  • Filing Date:

    04/04/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Courthouse:

    Downey Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

MICHAEL J. PEARCE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PACTRUX INC

20162 Sw Birch Street, Suite 375

Newport Beach, CA 92660

Defendant

JDH PACIFIC INC.

14821 Artesia Blvd

La Mirada, CA 90638

 

Court Documents

Notice (name extension) - E-Filing Payment Due

4/4/2017: Notice (name extension) - E-Filing Payment Due

Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

4/4/2017: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

Notice (name extension) - E-Filing Receipt of Documents

4/4/2017: Notice (name extension) - E-Filing Receipt of Documents

Other - (name extension) - SMALL CLAIMS SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT

6/27/2017: Other - (name extension) - SMALL CLAIMS SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT

Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims)

6/27/2017: Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims)

Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims)

6/27/2017: Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims)

Minute Order of 06/27/2017

6/27/2017: Minute Order of 06/27/2017

Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)

6/27/2017: Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)

Notice of Rejection

6/21/2017: Notice of Rejection

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/27/2017
  • Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims); Filed by: Pactrux Inc (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2017
  • Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims); Filed by: JDH PACIFIC, INC. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2017
  • Other - SMALL CLAIMS SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT; Filed by: Pactrux Inc (Plaintiff); JDH PACIFIC, INC. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2017
  • Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2017
  • Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order of 06/27/2017; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2017
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 06/27/2017 at 01:30 PM in Downey Courthouse at Department SE2 updated: Result Date to 06/27/2017; Result Type to Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2017
  • Order for dismissal Without Prejudice entered as to entire action , pursuant to 664.6

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2017
  • Notice of Rejection; Issued by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2017
  • Invoice: Small Claims > $1500;<=$5,000 Filing for >$1500 - CCP 116.230(b)(2); Fee: $50.00; Payment: 50.00 Receipt: 1170406E6315 (Credit Card); Balance: $0.00;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2017
  • Invoice: Web eFiling Transaction Fee - CRC 2.506; Fee: $10.00; Payment: 10.00 Receipt: 1170406E6315 (Credit Card); Balance: $0.00;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2017
  • Case assigned to Hon. Michael J. Pearce at Downey Courthouse in Department SE2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2017
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 06/27/2017 at 01:30 PM in Downey Courthouse at Department SE2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2017
  • Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court; Filed by: Pactrux Inc (Plaintiff); As to: JDH PACIFIC, INC. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2017
  • Notice E-Filing Receipt of Documents; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2017
  • Notice of E-Filing Acceptance (Small Claims)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2017
  • Notice E-Filing Payment Due; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where PACTRUX INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION is a litigant