This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/24/2019 at 04:19:02 (UTC).

PACKIT LLC VS MICHELS, JEANNETTE

Case Summary

On 02/23/2015 PACKIT LLC filed an Other lawsuit against MICHELS, JEANNETTE. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****2226

  • Filing Date:

    02/23/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PACKIT LLC

Defendant

MICHELS JEANNETTE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

WINSTON & STRAWN LLP

Defendant Attorneys

GAROFALO, ELLYN S.

GAROFALO ELLYN S.

 

Court Documents

Civil Case Cover Sheet

2/23/2015: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint

2/23/2015: Complaint

Notice of Ruling

9/2/2015: Notice of Ruling

Other - (name extension)

9/3/2015: Other - (name extension)

Other - (name extension)

9/3/2015: Other - (name extension)

(name extension) - PROOF OF SERVICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT

11/30/2015: (name extension) - PROOF OF SERVICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT

Other - (name extension)

8/23/2016: Other - (name extension)

Minute Order

8/23/2016: Minute Order

Minute Order - (Order to Show Cause - Failure to File Proof of Service and Fa...)

2/23/2018: Minute Order - (Order to Show Cause - Failure to File Proof of Service and Fa...)

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/23/2018
  • Minute Order (Order to Show Cause - Failure to File Proof of Service and Fa...)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2018
  • Order to Show Cause - Failure to File Proof of Service and Failure to File Default Judgment Pursuant to CRC 3.740 scheduled for 02/23/2018 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 77 updated: Result Date to 02/23/2018; Result Type to Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Court

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/20/2018
  • Case reassigned to Stanley Mosk Courthouse in Department 77

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/13/2016
  • NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF TRIAL FILED NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF TRIAL FILED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/26/2016
  • A/C ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE DELETED REASON: COURT ORDER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/23/2016
  • PRE-TRIAL MINUTES-CONTD TO 10/24/16 AT 08:30 A M IN DEPT. 77

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/23/2016
  • PRE-TRIAL MINUTES-CONTD TO 10/24/16 AT 08:30 A M IN DEPT. 77

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/23/2016
  • Clerk's Certificate of Mailing/Notice of Entry of Order; Filed by:

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/30/2015
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/03/2015
  • NOTICE OF TRANSMITTAL MAILED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
23 More Docket Entries
  • 02/25/2015
  • NON-JURY TRIAL SET FOR 08/23/16, 08:30 AM, DEPT 77

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/25/2015
  • MOTION FILED: MISCELLANEOUS MOTION HEARING SET FOR 8/31/15

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/25/2015
  • A/C - MOTION FILING REASON: OTHERS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/25/2015
  • MOTION FILED: MISCELLANEOUS MOTION HEARING SET FOR 8/31/15

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/25/2015
  • PROOF OF SERVICE FILED. PROOF OF SERVICE FILED.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/25/2015
  • A/C - MOTION FILING REASON: OTHERS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2015
  • A/C - COMPLAINT FILED REASON: OTHERS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2015
  • COMPLAINT FILED - OTHER Filing Fee: 225.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2015
  • SUMMONS FILED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2015
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by:

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less