This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/21/2019 at 01:26:03 (UTC).

PACIFIC SEAFOOD CO. INC VS UNITED FIVE STAR PRODUCTS INC

Case Summary

On 09/04/2015 PACIFIC SEAFOOD CO INC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against UNITED FIVE STAR PRODUCTS INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Norwalk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is DANIEL P RAMIREZ. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****3597

  • Filing Date:

    09/04/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

DANIEL P RAMIREZ

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PACIFIC SEAFOOD CO. INC

Defendants

UNITED FIVE STAR PRODUCTS INC DBA UNITED 5 STAR PRODUCTS INC

LEE DAE HEI

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

ATTORNEY AT LAW - STEVEN R. HRDLICKA

HRDLICKA STEVEN R.

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/27/2019
  • Order Case file destroyed per section(s) 71008 and/or 68152 of the Government Code; Issued by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/18/2016
  • DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE FILED FOR THE ENTIRE ACTION AS TO ALL DEFENDANT(S) AND ALL CAUSES OF ACTION(S).

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/16/2015
  • OSC HEARING IS SET FOR 08/20/18 AT 08:30A M., IN DEPARTMENT SEY . ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING SIGNED AND FILED BY DANIEL P RAMIREZ, JUDGE TO SHOW WHY SANCTIONS SHOULD NOT BE IMPOSED FOR FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE AND FAILURE TO FILE DEFAULT JUDGMENT PURSUANT TO CRC 3.740. CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FILED.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/04/2015
  • COLLECTIONS CASE COMPLAINT FILED PURSUANT TO CRC 3.740. RN NOR455965075. Filing Fee: 370.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/04/2015
  • SUMMONS ISSUED.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/04/2015
  • SUMMONS FILED.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less