This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/20/2019 at 09:56:33 (UTC).

PACIFIC PIONEER INSURANCE COMPANY VS LOS ANGELES UNIFIED SCHOOL DISTRICT

Case Summary

On 09/22/2017 PACIFIC PIONEER INSURANCE COMPANY filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against LOS ANGELES UNIFIED SCHOOL DISTRICT. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is GEORGINA T. RIZK. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2085

  • Filing Date:

    09/22/2017

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

GEORGINA T. RIZK

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PACIFIC PIONEER INSURANCE COMPANY

Defendant

LOS ANGELES UNIFIED SCHOOL DISTRICT

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

NIVINSKUS MARK ROBERT

 

Court Documents

Request for Dismissal

10/24/2017: Request for Dismissal

Proof of Personal Service

10/11/2017: Proof of Personal Service

Summons - on Complaint

9/22/2017: Summons - on Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet

9/22/2017: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint

9/22/2017: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

9/22/2017: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/26/2017
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 03/22/2019 at 08:30 AM in at Department 77 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 10/26/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2017
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 09/25/2020 at 08:30 AM in at Department 77 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 10/26/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2017
  • DocketRequest for dismissal Without Prejudice entered as to entire action

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2017
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by: Pacific Pioneer Insurance Company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2017
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: Pacific Pioneer Insurance Company (Plaintiff); As to: Los Angeles Unified School District (Defendant); Service Date: 10/04/2017; Service Cost: 69.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2017
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Pacific Pioneer Insurance Company (Plaintiff); As to: Los Angeles Unified School District (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2017
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Pacific Pioneer Insurance Company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2017
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2017
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2017
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Georgina T. Rizk in Department 77 Stanley Mosk Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2017
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 03/22/2019 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 77

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2017
  • DocketOSC - Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 09/25/2020 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 77

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Pacific Pioneer Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases where LOS ANGELES UNIFIED SCHOOL DISTRICT is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer NIVINSKUS MARK ROBERT