This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/25/2021 at 05:00:09 (UTC).

PACIFIC COAST BUSINESS INTERIORS, LLC, VS KAG CONSULTING INC.,

Case Summary

On 11/30/2018 PACIFIC COAST BUSINESS INTERIORS, LLC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against KAG CONSULTING INC . This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is WENDY CHANG. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******4468

  • Filing Date:

    11/30/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

WENDY CHANG

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PACIFIC COAST BUSINESS INTERIORS LLC

Defendant

KAG CONSULTING INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

HYNICK GEORGE RONALD

HYNICK GEORGE RONALD ESQ.

Defendant Attorney

LAWRENCE AMY B.

 

Court Documents

Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information - Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

6/21/2021: Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information - Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

Declaration in Support of Attorney's Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel-Civil - Declaration in Support of Attorney's Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel-Civil

7/12/2021: Declaration in Support of Attorney's Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel-Civil - Declaration in Support of Attorney's Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel-Civil

Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing on Motion to be Relieved as Counsel for Defendant KAG...)

8/9/2021: Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing on Motion to be Relieved as Counsel for Defendant KAG...)

Minute Order - Minute Order (Nunc Pro Tunc Order)

8/9/2021: Minute Order - Minute Order (Nunc Pro Tunc Order)

Proof of Service - Order Granting Attorney's Motion to be Relieved as Counsel - Proof of Service - Order Granting Attorney's Motion to be Relieved as Counsel

8/13/2021: Proof of Service - Order Granting Attorney's Motion to be Relieved as Counsel - Proof of Service - Order Granting Attorney's Motion to be Relieved as Counsel

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Order to Show Cause Re: Status of Defendant KAG Consulting In...) of 09/07/2021

9/7/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Order to Show Cause Re: Status of Defendant KAG Consulting In...) of 09/07/2021

Statement of the Case - Statement of the Case

9/15/2021: Statement of the Case - Statement of the Case

Witness List - Witness List

9/15/2021: Witness List - Witness List

Exhibit List - Exhibit List

9/15/2021: Exhibit List - Exhibit List

Exhibit List - Exhibit List

9/21/2021: Exhibit List - Exhibit List

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Non-Jury Trial; Order to Show Cause Re: Status of Defendant K...) of 09/23/2021

9/23/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Non-Jury Trial; Order to Show Cause Re: Status of Defendant K...) of 09/23/2021

Stipulation and Order (name extension) - Stipulation and Order to Continue Trial

2/18/2021: Stipulation and Order (name extension) - Stipulation and Order to Continue Trial

Answer - Answer

2/19/2019: Answer - Answer

Declaration (name extension) - Declaration Declaration of Non-Service

12/17/2018: Declaration (name extension) - Declaration Declaration of Non-Service

First Amended Standing Order - First Amended Standing Order

11/30/2018: First Amended Standing Order - First Amended Standing Order

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

11/30/2018: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

11/30/2018: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - Summons on Complaint

11/30/2018: Summons - Summons on Complaint

12 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/01/2021
  • Hearing11/01/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department 26 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for (Non-Jury Trial; Order to Show Cause Re: Status of Defendant K...) of 09/23/2021; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2021
  • DocketMinute Order (Non-Jury Trial; Order to Show Cause Re: Status of Defendant K...)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2021
  • DocketOn the Court's own motion, Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 09/23/2021 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26 Not Held - Continued - Court's Motion was rescheduled to 11/01/2021 08:30 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Status of Defendant KAG Consulting Inc.'s Legal Representation scheduled for 09/23/2021 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26 updated: Result Date to 09/23/2021; Result Type to Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2021
  • DocketUpdated -- Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information: As To Parties: KAG Consulting Inc., (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2021
  • DocketUpdated -- George Ronald Hynick, Esq. (Attorney): Name Suffix: Esq.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2021
  • DocketAddress for George Ronald Hynick, Esq. (Attorney) updated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2021
  • DocketExhibit List; Filed by: Pacific Coast Business Interiors, LLC, (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2021
  • DocketWitness List; Filed by: Pacific Coast Business Interiors, LLC, (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
27 More Docket Entries
  • 02/19/2019
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by: Kag Consulting Inc., (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2018
  • DocketDeclaration Declaration of Non-Service; Filed by: Pacific Coast Business Interiors, LLC, (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2018
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 12/03/2021 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 94

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2018
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 05/29/2020 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 94

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2018
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Wendy Chang in Department 94 Stanley Mosk Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2018
  • DocketFirst Amended Standing Order; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2018
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2018
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2018
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Pacific Coast Business Interiors, LLC, (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2018
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Pacific Coast Business Interiors, LLC, (Plaintiff); As to: Kag Consulting Inc., (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

b'

Case Number: 18STLC14468 Hearing Date: August 9, 2021 Dept: 26

Pacific Coast Business Interiors, LLC v. KAG\r\nConsulting, Inc., et al. 18STLC14468

MOTION TO BE\r\nRELIEVED AS COUNSEL

\r\n\r\n

(CCP § 284(2); CRC\r\nRule 3.1362)

\r\n\r\n

\r\n\r\n

\r\n\r\n

TENTATIVE RULING

\r\n\r\n

Amy B. Lawrence, Esq. of Lawrence\r\n& Associates’s Motion to be Relieved as Counsel for Defendant KAG\r\nConsulting, Inc. is GRANTED. PROPOSED ORDERS HAVE BEEN SUBMITTED. RULING TO BE\r\nEFFECTIVE UPON FILING OF PROOF OF SERVICE OF SIGNED ORDER UPON ALL PARTIES. ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: STATUS OF\r\nDEFENDANT KAG CONSULTING, INC.’S LEGAL REPRESENTATION IS SET FOR SEPTEMBER 7,\r\n2021 AT 9:30 AM IN DEPARTMENT 26 IN THE SPRING STREET COURTHOUSE.

Moving party to give notice.

'
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where KAG CONSULTING INC A CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer LAWRENCE AMY B. ESQ.