This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 03/04/2019 at 06:03:11 (UTC).

PACIFIC BMW VS TONY CHADO

Case Summary

On 10/02/2017 PACIFIC BMW filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against TONY CHADO. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Pasadena Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is WILLIAM D. DODSON. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1301

  • Filing Date:

    10/02/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Pasadena Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

WILLIAM D. DODSON

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PACIFIC BMW

800 S. Brand Blvd,

Glendale, CA 91204

Defendant

CHADO TONY

Fontana, CA 92336

 

Court Documents

Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims) - Christopher Segura

2/22/2018: Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims) - Christopher Segura

Certificate of Mailing for - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial) of 02/22/2018

2/22/2018: Certificate of Mailing for - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial) of 02/22/2018

Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)

2/22/2018: Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)

Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims) - Signed by Christopher Segura

5/18/2018: Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims) - Signed by Christopher Segura

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

5/18/2018: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Certificate of Mailing for - [Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)]

8/3/2018: Certificate of Mailing for - [Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)]

Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims)

7/13/2018: Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims)

Certificate of Mailing for - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial) of 07/13/2018 and Judgment Debtor Statement of Assets

7/13/2018: Certificate of Mailing for - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial) of 07/13/2018 and Judgment Debtor Statement of Assets

Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)

7/19/2018: Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)

Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)

7/13/2018: Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)

Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)

7/13/2018: Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)

Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)

5/18/2018: Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)

Certificate of Mailing for - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial) of 05/18/2018

5/18/2018: Certificate of Mailing for - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial) of 05/18/2018

Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims) [Event = HRG000]

11/16/2017: Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims) [Event = HRG000]

Plaintiff's Claim Cover Sheet (Postponement Before Service) (end date)

11/16/2017: Plaintiff's Claim Cover Sheet (Postponement Before Service) (end date)

Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

10/2/2017: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/03/2018
  • Certificate of Mailing for [Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)]; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2018
  • Address for Tony Chado (Defendant) clerical correction

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2018
  • Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims); Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2018
  • Updated -- Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims): Status Date changed from 07/19/2018 to 07/19/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2018
  • Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2018
  • On the Court's own motion, Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 07/13/2018 at 01:30 PM in Pasadena Courthouse at Department A Not Held - Rescheduled by Court was rescheduled to 07/13/2018 01:30 PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2018
  • Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2018
  • Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial) of 07/13/2018 and Judgment Debtor Statement of Assets; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2018
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 07/13/2018 at 01:30 PM in Pasadena Courthouse at Department A updated: Result Date to 07/13/2018; Result Type to Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2018
  • Court orders judgment entered for Plaintiff Pacific BMW against Defendant Tony Chado on the Plaintiff's Claim filed by Pacific BMW on 10/02/2017 for the principal amount of $5,000.00 and costs of $114.39 for a total of $5,114.39.

    Read MoreRead Less
6 More Docket Entries
  • 02/22/2018
  • Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims) Christopher Segura; Filed by: Pacific BMW (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2018
  • Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2018
  • Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial) of 02/22/2018; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2018
  • On the Court's own motion, Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 02/22/2018 at 08:30 AM in Pasadena Courthouse at Department A Held - Continued was rescheduled to 05/18/2018 01:30 PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2017
  • Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims); Filed by: Pacific BMW (Plaintiff); Has the Claim Been Served?: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2017
  • Pursuant to the request of plaintiff, Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 11/21/2017 at 08:30 AM in Pasadena Courthouse at Department A Not Held - Rescheduled by Party was rescheduled to 02/22/2018 08:30 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2017
  • Plaintiff's Claim Cover Sheet (Postponement Before Service); Issued by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2017
  • Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court; Filed by: Pacific BMW (Plaintiff); As to: Tony Chado (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2017
  • Case assigned to Hon. William D. Dodson in Department A Pasadena Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2017
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 11/21/2017 at 08:30 AM in Pasadena Courthouse at Department A

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where PACIFIC BMW [BC554425] is a litigant